Overton v. Wyeth LLC et al

Plaintiff: Gayle Overton
Defendant: Wyeth LLC, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Schwarz Pharma, Inc., Northstar RX, LLC, McKesson Corp. and Pfizer Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00491
Filed: September 10, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Clarke
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT of Dismissal, dismissing all of Plaintiff's claims against defendants Wyeth, LLC, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. and Schwarz Pharma, Inc. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/3/2012. (cmj)
August 1, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: 64 Stipulation of Dismissal. All of Plaintiff Gayle Overton's claims against Defendant Northstar Rx, LLC are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/1/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 7, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The 50 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED and all of the Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Wyeth LLC, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Pfizer, Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/7/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 22, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 58 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. It is ordered that all of the Plaintiff's claims against Defendant McKesson Corporation are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/22/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 15, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION to Remand filed by Gayle Overton, denying motion to remand.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/15/2010. (cmj)
October 29, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION to Remand filed by Gayle Overton. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that the motion to remand (Doc. 16) be DENIED. Objections due 11/12/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/29/10. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overton v. Wyeth LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Overton
Represented By: Jere L. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth LLC
Represented By: Philip H. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Philip H. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar RX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Philip H. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?