Jones v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Jones
Defendant: Johnny Miller and Sam Cochran
Case Number: 1:2010cv00495
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 146 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 144 Judicial Complaint filed by Timothy Jones. Insofar as plaintiff is requesting that the undersigned, as Chief Judge, review, interfere with, or otherwise consider the propriety of Judge DuBose's rulings in this case, that request is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/9/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
November 6, 2012 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 128 Motion for Hearing before District Judge; denying 128 Motion for New Trial; denying 128 Motion to Set Aside Judgment; denying 128 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/6/2012. copies to parties. (sdb)
October 24, 2012 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 125 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 125 Motion for New Trial; denying 126 Motion to Stay due to lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/24/2012. (cmj)
June 21, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion for Authorization of Expenses, as set out, with leave to refile once the issue of liability is determined. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/21/2012. (cmj)
February 1, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 60 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is DENIED as to Jones' claim against defendant Deputy Sheriff Johnny Miller (count one) and GRANTED as to Jones' claim against defendant Sheriff Sam Cochran (count two). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/1/12. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?