Essex Insurance Company v. Foley et al

Plaintiff: Essex Insurance Company
Defendant: Michael E. Foley, Susan M. Foley and Water's Edge, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00511
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court Order directing the Clerk to enter a default against Water's Edge, LLC on all claims asserted by the plaintiff. In light of the pendency of plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants, no default judgment will be entered against Water's Edge until those remaining claims have been resolved. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/16/2011. Copy mailed to Water's Edge. (tgw)
October 31, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 58 Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Essex Insurance Company, denying 61 MOTION to Strike filed by Michael E. Foley, Susan M. Foley. Water's Edge is ordered to Show Cause by 11/10/2011 why default should not be entered against it as a sanction for its persistent failure/refusal to comply with court orders. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/31/2011. Copy mailed to Water's Edge (tgw)
May 5, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/5/2011. (tgw)
January 27, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying the 14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Water's Edge, LLC. Water's Edge is ordered to file an answer by 2/7/2011. The parties' Rule 26 Meeting Report is due by 2/17/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/27/2011. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Essex Insurance Company v. Foley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essex Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Scott Traweek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Water's Edge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?