Branch Banking and Trust Company v. R&T Rentals, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: R&T Rentals, L.L.C., F. Rutherford Smith, Jr. and C. Thurmon Bell
Case Number: 1:2010cv00518
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The stay is lifted and this action is dismissed without prejudice as to defendant C. Thurmon Bell. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this action. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/30/2012. (sdb)
July 12, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Branch Banking and Trust Company against R&T Rentals, L.L.C., F. Rutherford Smith, Jr. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/12/2012. (cmj)
December 20, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion to Reopen Case. The case is reinstated as to Smith and R & T but remains stayed as to defendant Bell. See deadlines included in order.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/20/2011. (cmj)
October 17, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court Order staying action as to defendant Bell due to his bankruptcy filing. ( Status Report due by 1/3/2012 from Bell.) Defendants Smith and R&T Rentals have been dismissed with prejudice. Therefore, since Bell is the only remaining defendant, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this action for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/17/2011. (cmj)
April 22, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 22 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by R&T Rentals, L.L.C., F. Rutherford Smith, Jr., denying as moot 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by C. Thurmon Bell, denying 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by F. Rutherford Smith, Jr. be denied as set out.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/22/2011. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. R&T Rentals, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Judson Clark Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&T Rentals, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Rutherford Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Thurmon Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?