Vision Bank v. 145, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Defendant: 145, LLC, Scott D. Deichmann, Anthony J. Bordlee, James Dalton, Cynthia C. Kessler, Jack J. Scariano, III and David J. Lukinovich
Case Number: 1:2010cv00521
Filed: September 21, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2012 192 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of SE Property Holdings, LLC against 145, LLC. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/20/2012. (cmj)
March 12, 2012 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 180 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/9/2012. (cmj)
March 2, 2012 179 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: Vision Bank's request for attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's Supplement (doc. 173) is stricken as set out. Miscellaneous deadline set for 3/21/2012 for plaintiff to file a new motion for attorneys fees as set out; Miscellaneous deadline set for 3/28/2012 for defendant, 145, LLC to file any response.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/1/2012. (cmj)
November 28, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 171 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Vision Bank. Plaintiff Vision Banks claims against Defendant Cynthia Kesslerare DISMISSED without prejudice and Defendant Cynthia Kesslers counterclaims against PlaintiffVision Bank is DISMISSED with prejudice, and without further order of the Court.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/28/2011. (cmj)
November 4, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Vision Bank's 142 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts One and Two of the Complaint with the exception of the 18% post-judgment interest rate; granting 147 Vision Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defenda nts/Counter-Plaintiffs' counterclaims. Vision Bank's request for leave to prove the amount of attorneys' fees and costs is granted. Vision Bank is ordered to file NLT 11/18/11 materials to support its claim for costs and fees. Defendants/CounterPlaintiffs are ordered to file any response NLT 12/2/11. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/4/2011. (cmj)
August 19, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 158 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Vision Bank, 157 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Vision Bank. Objections due by 8/29/2011. If no objections filed, plaintiff's claims against defendants Dalton and Lukinovich shall be dismissed with prejudice without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/18/2011. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Bank v. 145, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Represented By: Ashley Sheehan Swink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 145, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. Deichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Bordlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia C. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack J. Scariano, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Lukinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?