Dreding v. Toney

Petitioner: Burnice Taft Dreding, Jr.
Respondent: Deborah Toney
Case Number: 1:2010cv00525
Filed: September 22, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/20/2011. Copies to parties. (sdb)
June 14, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; 31 Motion IFP denied at doc. 32 Endorsed Order, and Adopting, re 34 the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge made under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(l)(B) as the opinion of this Court. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/14/11. (Clerk mailed copy to Appellant, e-mailed to USCA). (jal)
March 2, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS with revisions re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Burnice Taft Dreding, Jr. The habeas petition is denied and this action is dismissed.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/2/2011. (copy mailed) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dreding v. Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Burnice Taft Dreding, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deborah Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?