Helton et al v. Vision Bank

Plaintiff: J. Philip Helton and J. Philip Helton Real Estate and Development, Inc.
Defendant: Vision Bank
Case Number: 1:2010cv00563
Filed: October 14, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Charging Order Against J. Philip Helton - pursuant to Rule 69(a)(1) of the Federal Rules ofCivil Procedure and Section 10A-5-6.05 of the Alabama Code, the financial interests of J. PhilipHelton in The Beach Party, LLC, Dalton & Helton, LLC, GC Develo pment, LLC, AlabamaGetaway, LLC, and PK Management, LLC (collectively, the Limited Liability Companies) be charged with payment of the Judgment rendered in this action (less any payments or creditsreceived), any accrued interest thereon, and costs.It is FURTHER ORDERED that said Limited Liability Companies are to report and todistribute to Vision Bank any amounts that are otherwise to become due or distributable to J.Philip Helton.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/23/2011. (cmj)
September 8, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Vision Bank against J. Philip Helton. Judgment is entered in the principal amount of $398,435.67, plus accrued and unpaid interest in the amount of $26,460.00, default interest of $36,509.43, late charges of $ ;546.09, and $7,038.86 of other charges and fees, for a total amount of $468,990.05, as of July 15, 2011, with interest continuing to accrue on the principal amount from July 15, 2011 until the date of this Judgment in the amount of $35.97 per diem. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/8/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
August 25, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Vision Bank as to Count One of its Counterclaim against Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant J. Philip Helton. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/25/2011. (cmj)
August 22, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Vision Bank's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count One of its Counterclaims against Plaintiff/Couterclaim Defedant J. Philip Helton. The Court declines Vision Banks invitation to enter a partial final judgment be fore attorneysfees and related costs are calculated. Vision Bank isORDERED to file and serve, on or before August 29, 2011, whatever materials it deems necessaryand appropriate to support its claim for costs and fees. Helton is ORDERED to file and serve anyresponse on or before September 6, 2011, at which time the Court will take under submission theissue of costs and fees.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/22/2011. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helton et al v. Vision Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Philip Helton
Represented By: Michael Shane Lucado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Philip Helton Real Estate and Development, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Shane Lucado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Bank
Represented By: Frederick George Helmsing, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?