Melech v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Plaintiff: Diane G. Melech
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and CIGNA Corporation
Case Number: 1:2010cv00573
Filed: October 15, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2015 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 211 Motion for Attorney Fees as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/25/2015. (cmj)
August 11, 2015 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 216 Motion to Strike ; granting 196 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/10/2015. (cmj)
January 15, 2015 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 189 Motion to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/15/2015. (cmj)
September 18, 2012 163 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing this action with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff Diane G. Melech. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/18/2012. (cmj)
July 24, 2012 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 134 Motion for Relief under FRCP 56(d)as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/23/2012. (cmj)
July 18, 2012 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's appeal (docs. 130 & 131). The Magistrate Judge's Order (doc. 129) is affirmed and the motion to stay (doc. 132) is denied as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/18/2012. (cmj)
April 27, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 68 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Diane G. Melech. Defendant is ordered to supplement its response with any written documentation, etc., as set out. Defendant is ordered to produce, pursuant to the protective order, the claims procedure manual in its entirety. Otherwise the Magistrate Judge's rulings are affirmed in all respects. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/26/2012. (cmj)
March 18, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that Defendant CIGNA Corporation and Defendant CIGNA Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 12) is GRANTED and that Defendant CIGNA Corporation and Defendant CIGNA Holdings, Inc. are DISMISSED from this action. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/18/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melech v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane G. Melech
Represented By: Brandy B. Hambright-Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?