Evans v. Mobile County Health Department

Plaintiff: Sandra Evans
Defendant: Mobile County Health Department
Case Number: 1:2010cv00600
Filed: November 2, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion to Retax Costs. The plaintiff is taxed costs in the amount of $1,586.40. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/14/2012. (tgw)
March 8, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/8/2012. (sdb)
February 23, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 45 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Sandra Evans. The Magistrate Judge's order is affirmed as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/23/2012. (tgw)
January 24, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered GRANTING 26 Motion to Compel Discovery, and GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 36 Motion to Dismiss. This motion is denied to the extent defendant seeks dismissal of plaintiffs lawsuit but it is granted to the extent the defendant seeks sanctions alternative to dismissal of this action, as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/24/2012. (clr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Mobile County Health Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Evans
Represented By: Steven L. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile County Health Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?