BP Products North America Inc v. Merritt Oil Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: BP Products North America Inc
Defendant: Merritt Oil Company, Inc., Richard Blow, Richard Merritt and R. Fred Walding
Case Number: 1:2010cv00625
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of BP Products North America Inc against Merritt Oil Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/11/2012. (cmj)
October 14, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 46 Motion for Attorney Fees. BP Products is awarded a total of $26,219.30, which is the sum of reasonable attorneys' fees in the amount of $26,213.50 and expenses in the amount of $5.80. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/14/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
September 8, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. It is ORDERED that BP Products' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Counts I, III, IV, V, and VI of its Complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Count II of the Complaint is DISMISSED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/8/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
July 1, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying case as to Defendant Richard Blow (re: 29 Suggestion of Bankruptcy). This stay shall have no effect with respect to Plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants and this action shall proceed as to those Defendants. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/1/2011. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BP Products North America Inc v. Merritt Oil Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BP Products North America Inc
Represented By: Sandy G. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merritt Oil Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Blow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Fred Walding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?