GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. v. Small et al
Plaintiff: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co.
Defendant: Stanley E. Small, The Estate of Ryan Scott Small and Frank H. Kruse
Case Number: 1:2010cv00641
Filed: November 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/2/2012. (cmj)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 86 Motion for Summary Judgment by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co.; denying 100 Motion for Hearing before District Judge. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/15/12. copies to parties. (sdb)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re: 91 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court reconsiders the November 29, 2011 Order (doc. 90) and Defendant George's Motion to Amend (doc. 82) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/12/2011. (cmj)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 41 Motion to Strike Jury Demand, as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/11/2011. (cmj)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 43 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/28/2011. (sdb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. v. Small et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Christina M. Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley E. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Ryan Scott Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank H. Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?