Alms v. Laboratory Corporation of America et al

Plaintiff: Brenda H. Alms
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America and Lexis Nexis Medical Review Services
Case Number: 1:2010cv00646
Filed: November 24, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered that claims of Plaintiff are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/1/2012. (cmj)
December 20, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion to Amend Complaint as set out. The Clerk is directed to correct the docket as set out.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/20/2011. (cmj)
December 16, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that the Court finds "Charlene" was fraudulently joined in these proceedings and that her alleged Alabama citizenship is to be ignored for jurisdictional purposes. Alms' citizenship is diverse from Lexis Nexis' and Winn-Dixie's and the Court is satisfied that it has subject matter jurisdiction over this case and that removal from the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama was proper. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/16/2011. (cmj)
December 2, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for parties to file briefs as set out. The motions deadline previously set is reset to 1/6/12. ( Brief due by 12/9/2011) (Motions deadline reset to 1/6/2012.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/2/2011. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alms v. Laboratory Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda H. Alms
Represented By: Charles H. Morris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexis Nexis Medical Review Services
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?