Cunningham v. Honeywell International, Inc.
Plaintiff: William M. Cunningham, Jr.
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc., Aearo Company 1, Allied-Signal, Inc., Bendix Foundation Brake Corporation, Borg-Warner, Amchem Products, Inc., American Optical Corporation, Anchor Packing Company, A.W. Chesterton, Cablec Corporation, CBS Corporation, Certainteed Corp., Champion International, Charter, Inc., Charter Consolidated, P.L.c., Charter Consolidated Finance Limited, Charter Consolidated Financial Services Limited, Charter Consolidated Investments Limited, Charter Consolidated Services Limited, Collyer Insulated Wire Company, Compudyne, Inc. formerly Robintech, Inc., d/b/a York Shipley, Inc., Consolidated Mines Selection Company Limited, Crown Cork & Seal USA Co., Inc., Dana Corporation, DB Riley, Eastern Safety Equipment Co., Aearo Corporation, E.D. Bullard Company, E.H. O'Neil Co., Inc., Ericsson, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster-Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, General Refractories Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Gulf Belting & Gasket Co., Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Industrial Rubber and Specialty Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Insulation Engineers, Inc., Insulation Contracting, Inc. of Alabama, Jamestown Metal and Marine Sales, John Crane Company, Inc., Louis M. Gerson Company, Inc., Maremont Corp., Marine Specialty Company, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Mobil Oil Company, National Service Industries, Inc., North Brothers Company, Norton Company, Oglebay Norton Company, Okonite Company, Okonite Incorporated, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc., Rapid American Corporation, Rayloc, Reilly-Benton Company, Inc., Selby, Battersby & Co. d/b/a S.B. Decking, Inc., Standard Equipment Company, Inc., Standard Motor Products, Strafco, U.C. Realty Corp., Uniroyal, Inc., Uniroyal Fiber & Textire Division of Uniroyal, Inc., Viacom, Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Zurn Industries, Inc. and Wagner Electric
Case Number: 1:2010cv00671
Filed: December 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Order STRIKING #234 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by General Electric Company, #233 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by General Electric Company, #232 Answer to Complaint filed by General Electric Company as they were improperly filed with the Court. This action has been transferred to USDC for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania as an MDL Action, no. 11-63918. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/22/2011. (cmj)
June 16, 2011 Filing 234 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by General Electric Company. (Evans, Jenelle)
June 15, 2011 Filing 233 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant General Electric Company. (Evans, Jenelle)
June 15, 2011 Filing 232 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by General Electric Company. (Evans, Jenelle)
May 9, 2011 Filing 231 RESPONSE to #218 Notice (Other), #220 Notice (Other), #217 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #212 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on Statute of Limitations PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint Filed 12-3-10), #2 Exhibit B (Letters Testamentary), #3 Exhibit C (Rule 41a1, Insulation Engineers, Inc.), #4 Exhibit D (Pl's Resp in Opp to Defs MTD filed 4-14-11), #5 Exhibit E (Summons Returns filed 3-31-11), #6 Exhibit F (Rule 41a1, Marine Specialty Company, Inc.), #7 Exhibit G (Rule 41a1, Standard Equipment Company, Inc.), #8 Exhibit H (S.D. AL Docket Sheet 4-4-11), #9 Exhibit I (Amended Complaint Filed 4-5-11), #10 Exhibit J (Memorandum in Support)) (Nelson, Scott)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER on #222 , #227 , #205 , #224 , #206 Corporate Disclosure Statements. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/2/2011. (sdb)
April 29, 2011 Filing 229 RESPONSE to #228 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Joinders PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Rule 41a1, Insulation Engineer, Inc.), #3 Exhibit C (Summons Returns), #4 Exhibit D (Rule 41a1, Marine Specialty Company, Inc.), #5 Exhibit E (Rule 41a1, Standard Equipment Company, Inc.), #6 Exhibit F (Docket Sheet), #7 Exhibit G (Amended Complaint), #8 Exhibit H (Memorandum in Opposition)) (Nelson, Scott)
April 28, 2011 Filing 228 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Joinders by Rapid American Corporation. (McCafferty, Emit)
April 28, 2011 Filing 227 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Rapid American Corporation. (McCafferty, Emit)
April 28, 2011 This action has been transferred to U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Pennsylvania as a Multi-District Litigation (MDL-875)asbestos action. (See document 213). The new case number for this action in Pennsylvania is 11-63918. All docketing is to be conducted in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania with the referenced case no. (cmj)
April 27, 2011 Filing 225 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Foseco, Inc.. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 27, 2011 Filing 224 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Gulf Belting & Gasket Co., Inc.. (Hays, Bradley)
April 27, 2011 Filing 223 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gulf Belting & Gasket Co., Inc.. (Hays, Bradley)
April 27, 2011 Filing 222 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Borg-Warner. (Hays, Bradley)
April 27, 2011 Filing 221 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Borg-Warner. (Hays, Bradley)
April 27, 2011 Filing 220 NOTICE by Amchem Products, Inc., Certainteed Corp., Dana Corporation, Maremont Corp. re #212 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on Statute of Limitations (Davis, Evelyn)
April 27, 2011 Filing 219 RESPONSE to #210 Joinder in Motion, PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Rule 41a1, Insulation Engineer, Inc.), #3 Exhibit C (Summons Returns), #4 Exhibit D (Rule 41a1, Marine Specialty Company, Inc.), #5 Exhibit E (Rule 41a1, Standard Equipment Company, Inc.), #6 Exhibit F (Docket Sheet), #7 Exhibit G (Amended Complaint), #8 Exhibit H (Memorandum in Opposition)) (Nelson, Scott)
April 26, 2011 Filing 218 NOTICE by A.W. Chesterton Joinder in Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on Statute of Limitations (McDonough, Edward)
April 26, 2011 Filing 217 NOTICE by Ericsson, Inc. re #212 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on Statute of Limitations (Defendant Ericsson, Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants' Motion For Judgment On Pleadings Based On Statute Of Limitations) (Collier, Stephen)
April 26, 2011 Filing 216 NOTICE by Ericsson, Inc. re #207 Reply to Response to Motion (Defendant Ericsson, Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants' Reply To Plaintiffs' Response In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction) (Collier, Stephen)
April 26, 2011 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Mapp Hardee on behalf of CBS Corporation (Hardee, Nicole)
April 26, 2011 Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Mapp Hardee on behalf of Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company (Hardee, Nicole)
April 25, 2011 Filing 213 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Eastern District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of action. Record to be extracted by USDC Pennsylvania. Case Closed. (cmj)
April 25, 2011 Filing 212 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on Statute of Limitations by Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, National Service Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law) (Partridge, Donald)
April 22, 2011 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Sydney F. Frazier, Jr on behalf of Okonite Company, Okonite Incorporated (Frazier, Sydney)
April 22, 2011 Filing 210 Joinder in MOTION re #133 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #124 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Joinder in A.W. Chesterton Company's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law, #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #68 MOTION to Dismiss. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 21, 2011 Filing 209 REPLY to #207 Reply to Response to Motion (Joinder) filed by A.W. Chesterton. (McDonough, Edward)
April 21, 2011 Filing 208 Documents endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #205 filed by Amchem Products, Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement #206 filed by Foster-Wheeler Corporation. A review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (ctn)
April 21, 2011 Filing 207 REPLY to Response to Motion #40 filed by Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, National Service Industries, Inc.. (Partridge, Donald)
April 21, 2011 Filing 206 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Foster-Wheeler Corporation. (Redditt, F.)
April 21, 2011 Filing 205 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Amchem Products, Inc.. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 21, 2011 Filing 204 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Amchem Products, Inc.. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 21, 2011 Filing 203 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Helmsing, Frederick)
April 20, 2011 Filing 226 RETURN OF SERVICE of green card re: Order, (doc. 162) served 4/15/11 as to State of Alabama AG (cmj)
April 20, 2011 Filing 202 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Foster-Wheeler Corporation. (Redditt, F.)
April 20, 2011 Filing 201 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Georgia-Pacific Corporation. (Wheeler, Allan)
April 20, 2011 Filing 200 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Foster-Wheeler Corporation. (Redditt, F.)
April 20, 2011 Filing 199 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Scott, Joi)
April 19, 2011 Filing 198 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Zurn Industries, Inc.. (Waudby, William)
April 19, 2011 Filing 197 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Waudby, William)
April 19, 2011 Filing 196 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Owens-Illinois, Inc.. (Harlow, Anthony)
April 19, 2011 Filing 195 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Crown Cork & Seal USA Co., Inc.. (McClurkin, Anne)
April 19, 2011 Filing 194 General Parts, Inc., incorrectly identified as Strafco a/k/a/ Strafco, Inc. a/k/a General Parts, Inc. and Strafco, a/k/a General Parts, Inc., ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Strafco. (Smith, Will)
April 19, 2011 Filing 193 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Maremont Corp.. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 19, 2011 Filing 192 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Certainteed Corp.. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 19, 2011 Filing 191 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Dana Corporation. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 19, 2011 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Clarke on behalf of Rapid American Corporation (Clarke, Timothy)
April 19, 2011 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Clarke on behalf of Foster-Wheeler Corporation (Clarke, Timothy)
April 19, 2011 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by F. Grey Redditt, Jr on behalf of Rapid American Corporation (Redditt, F.)
April 19, 2011 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by F. Grey Redditt, Jr on behalf of Foster-Wheeler Corporation (Redditt, F.)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Order temporarily granting #176 MOTION for Robert H. Sprain, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Norton Company. In the event that Mr. Sprain has not been admitted to the Bar of this Court by 5/23/2011, he shall show cause, by 6/6/2011, as to why he should not be removed as counsel. That portion of the local rule upon which Mr. Sprain relies in this motion was intended to provide non-members of the Alabama Bar (usually out-of-state attorneys) a limited opportunity to appear in a particular case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/18/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER on #178 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ericsson, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/18/2011. (sdb)
April 18, 2011 Filing 184 RESPONSE to #181 Joinder in Motion PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Rule 41a1, Insulation Engineer, Inc.), #3 Exhibit C (Summons Returns), #4 Exhibit D (Rule 41a1, Marine Specialty Company, Inc.), #5 Exhibit E (Rule 41a1, Standard Equipment Company, Inc.), #6 Exhibit F (Docket Sheet), #7 Exhibit G (Amended Complaint), #8 Exhibit H (Memorandum in Opposition)) (Nelson, Scott)
April 18, 2011 Filing 183 International Paper Company's ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Champion International. (Butts, Casey)
April 17, 2011 Filing 182 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by DB Riley. (Windham, Donald)
April 15, 2011 Filing 181 Joinder in MOTION re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Certain Defendants' Request for Additional Time to Answer and/or Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (House, James)
April 15, 2011 Filing 180 Documents endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #175 filed by Norton Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement #178 filed by Ericsson, Inc. A review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (ctn)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER on #175 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Norton Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/15/2011. Copies to parties. (sdb)
April 15, 2011 Filing 178 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Ericsson, Inc.. (Collier, Stephen)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #168 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Industrial Holdings Corporation on 5/3/2011; Ingersoll-Rand Company on 5/3/2011; National Service Industries, Inc. on 5/3/2011; North Brothers Company on 5/3/2011. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/15/2011. (sdb)
April 14, 2011 Filing 176 MOTION for Robert H. Sprain, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Norton Company. ($50 payment; #20377) Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (cmj)
April 14, 2011 Filing 175 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Norton Company. (Sprain, Robert)
April 14, 2011 Filing 174 Norton Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Norton Company. (Sprain, Robert)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order mooting #166 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal as to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Oglebay Norton Company. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/14/2011. (sdb)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: #170 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. All of the Plf's claims against Defendant Selby, Battersby & Co. d/b/a S.B. Decking, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/14/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 14, 2011 Filing 171 RESPONSE to #124 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Joinder in A.W. Chesterton Company's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law, #144 Notice of Joinder, #156 Joinder in Motion, #68 MOTION to Dismiss, #148 Joinder in Motion, #133 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #159 Joinder in Motion, #167 Joinder in Motion, PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Rule 41a1, Insulation Engineers, Inc.), #3 Exhibit C (Summons Returns), #4 Exhibit D (Rule 41a1, Marine Specialty Company, Inc.), #5 Exhibit E (Rule 41a1, Standard Equipment Company, Inc.), #6 Exhibit F (Docket Sheet), #7 Exhibit G (Amended Complaint), #8 Exhibit H (Memorandum in Opposition)) (Nelson, Scott)
April 14, 2011 Filing 170 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO SELBY, BATTERSBY & CO. D/B/A SB DECKING, INC. (Nelson, Scott)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER on #163 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Georgia-Pacific Corporation. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/13/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 13, 2011 Filing 168 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, National Service Industries, Inc., North Brothers Company. (House, James)
April 13, 2011 Filing 167 Joinder in MOTION re #133 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #124 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Joinder in A.W. Chesterton Company's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law, #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #68 MOTION to Dismiss. (Harris, James)
April 13, 2011 Filing 166 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal as to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Oglebay Norton Company. (Tubb, Jones) Modified on 4/13/2011 (cmj).
April 13, 2011 Filing 165 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #163 filed by Georgia-Pacific Corporation. A review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (ctn)
April 13, 2011 Filing 164 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Mobil Oil Company. (Eaton, Rocky)
April 12, 2011 Filing 163 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Georgia-Pacific Corporation. (Cavender, C.)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Order certifying constitutional question. Should the Attorney General wish to intervene, he is ordered to do so on or before 6/13/2011. ( Intervention deadline set for 6/13/2011.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/12/2011. (certified mail to State of Alabama Attorney General) 70092820000109631990 (cmj)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER on #158 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Okonite Company, Okonite Incorporated. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/11/2011. (cmj)
April 11, 2011 Filing 160 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #158 filed by Okonite Company, Okonite Incorporated. A review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (ctn)
April 11, 2011 Filing 159 Joinder in MOTION re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (House, James)
April 11, 2011 Filing 158 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Okonite Company, Okonite Incorporated. (Turner, Michael)
April 11, 2011 Filing 157 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by The Okonite Company, Inc., incorrectly identified as Okonite Company and Okonite Incorporated by Okonite Company, Okonite Incorporated. (Turner, Michael)
April 11, 2011 Filing 156 Joinder in MOTION re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by International Paper Company. (Butts, Casey)
April 11, 2011 Filing 155 Ericsson, Inc.'s ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Ericsson, Inc.. (Collier, Stephen)
April 11, 2011 Filing 154 Documents endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #145 filed by Ford Motor Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement #132 filed by Strafco, Corporate Disclosure Statement #140 filed by DB Riley, Corporate Disclosure Statement #137 filed by Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement #146 filed by Owens-Illinois, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #136 filed by Crown Cork & Seal USA Co., Inc. A review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (ctn)
April 11, 2011 Filing 153 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company. (Harris, James)
April 11, 2011 Filing 152 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by CBS Corporation. (Harris, James)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER on #146 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Owens-Illinois, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/8/2011. (sdb)
April 8, 2011 Filing 150 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by A.W. Chesterton. (McDonough, Edward)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER on #145 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ford Motor Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/8/2011. (sdb)
April 8, 2011 Filing 148 Joinder in MOTION re #133 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #68 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ericsson, Inc.. (Collier, Stephen)
April 8, 2011 Filing 147 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Amended Notice of Constitutional Challenge (Malcom, Brooke)
April 8, 2011 Filing 146 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc.. (Harlow, Anthony)
April 8, 2011 Filing 145 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Malcom, Brooke)
April 8, 2011 Filing 144 Notice of Joinder by Honeywell International, Inc., John Crane Company, Inc. re: #124 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Joinder in A.W. Chesterton Company's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Lankford, Frank)
April 7, 2011 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Joi C. Scott on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Scott, Joi)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER on #140 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Riley Stoker Corporation. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/7/2011. (sdb)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Order re: #120 Notice of constitutional challenges filed by Ford Motor Company. The Court will not recognize Ford Motor Companysconstitutional challenges or certify them to the Attorney General of Alabama as set out. Defendant Ford Motor Company to promptly file anamended Notice of Constitutional Challenge which clearly states the constitutional questions it is raising in this action. Ford Motor Company is further ORDERED to serve the Attorney General of Alabama with copies of the amended notice and pleading in which it raises itsconstitutional questions. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/7/2011. (cmj)
April 7, 2011 Filing 140 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants DB Riley, Babcock Power, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Babcock Power, Inc. for DB Riley.. (Windham, Donald)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER on #136 and #137 Corporate Disclosure Statements. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/7/2011. (sdb)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER on #127 and #132 Corporate Disclosure Statements. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/7/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 7, 2011 Filing 137 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company. (Harris, James)
April 7, 2011 Filing 136 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Crown Cork & Seal USA Co., Inc.. (McClurkin, Anne)
April 7, 2011 Filing 135 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Crown Cork & Seal USA Co., Inc.. (McClurkin, Anne)
April 6, 2011 Filing 134 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Owens-Illinois, Inc.. (Harlow, Anthony)
April 6, 2011 Filing 133 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Owens-Illinois, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Harlow, Anthony)
April 6, 2011 Filing 132 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Strafco, General Parts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent General Parts, Inc. for Strafco.. (Smith, Will)
April 6, 2011 Filing 131 Ericsson, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Ericsson, Inc.. (Collier, Stephen)
April 6, 2011 Filing 130 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Notice of Filing #127 filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. A review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (ctn)
April 6, 2011 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Alldredge Fleming on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Fleming, Suzanne)
April 6, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr re #92 Amended Complaint,,,, Notice of Attachment of Certificate of Service to Amended Complaint filed 4/5/2011. NOTE: There are NO CHANGES to the Amended Complaint: only the inclusion of electronic Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (Nelson, Scott)
April 6, 2011 Filing 127 Notice of Filing Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Vercher, Michael)
April 6, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Garner Malcom on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Malcom, Brooke)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER on #109 , #110 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dana Corporation, filed by Maremont Corp.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/6/2011. (cmj)
April 6, 2011 Filing 124 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Joinder in A.W. Chesterton Company's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Georgia-Pacific Corporation. (Wheeler, Allan)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER on #116 , #118 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, filed by Zurn Industries, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/6/2011. (cmj)
April 6, 2011 Filing 122 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rapid American Corporation. (McCafferty, Emit)
April 6, 2011 Filing 121 Documents endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #116 filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement #109 filed by Dana Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement #118 filed by Zurn Industries, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #94 filed by Champion International, Corporate Disclosure Statement #110 filed by Maremont Corp., Corporate Disclosure Statement #98 filed by Rayloc. A review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (ctn)
April 6, 2011 Filing 120 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Constitutional Challenge (Malcom, Brooke)
April 6, 2011 Filing 119 Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Ford Motor Company. (Malcom, Brooke)
April 6, 2011 Filing 118 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Non-Party Zurn Industries, Inc.. (Waudby, William)
April 6, 2011 Filing 117 Zurn Industries, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Zurn Industries, Inc.. (Waudby, William)
April 6, 2011 Filing 116 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Waudby, William)
April 6, 2011 Filing 115 Goodyear Tire and Rubber ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Waudby, William)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DISMISSING PARTY Wagner Electric re: Notice #95 filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/6/2011. (cmj)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DISMISSING PARTY Compudyne, Inc., formerly Robintech, Inc. re: Notice #82 filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/6/2011. (cmj)
April 6, 2011 Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William M. Cunningham, Jr. Cablec Corporation served on 3/31/2011, answer due 4/21/2011. (Nelson, Scott)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER on #98 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Genuine Parts Company a/k/a Rayloc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/6/2011. (cmj)
April 6, 2011 Filing 110 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Maremont Corp.. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 6, 2011 Filing 109 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Dana Corporation. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 6, 2011 Filing 108 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Maremont Corp.. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 6, 2011 Filing 107 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Dana Corporation. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 6, 2011 Filing 106 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Vercher, Michael)
April 5, 2011 Filing 105 Notice of Appearance as additional counsel by Strafco. (Smyth, John) Modified on 4/6/2011 (cmj).
April 5, 2011 Filing 104 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Strafco. (Smith, Will)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER on #77 and #94 Corporate Disclosure Statements. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/5/2011. (sdb)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #66 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Standard Equipment Company, Inc. per #74 . Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. (ctn)
April 5, 2011 Filing 101 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #77 filed by CertainTeed Corp. A review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #56 Motion to Dismiss Defendant E.D. Bullard Company per #87 . Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. (ctn)
April 5, 2011 Filing 99 NOTICE by Rayloc of Tag Along Action (Northcutt, Robert)
April 5, 2011 Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Rayloc. (Northcutt, Robert)
April 5, 2011 Filing 97 ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, by Rayloc. (Northcutt, Robert)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: #78 Notice of Dismissal filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. Plf's claims against Defendant Standard Motor Products are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. (sdb)
April 5, 2011 Filing 95 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO WAGNER ELECTRIC A/K/A WAGNER ELECTRIC CORPORATION A/K/A WAGNER BRAKE PRODUCTS (Nelson, Scott)
April 5, 2011 Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Champion International. (Butts, Casey)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DISMISSING PARTY Reilly-Benton Company, Inc. without prejudice re: Notice #59 filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. (cmj)
April 5, 2011 Filing 92 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A.W. Chesterton, Allied-Signal, Inc., Amchem Products, Inc., Bendix Foundation Brake Corporation, Borg-Warner, CBS Corporation, Cablec Corporation, Certainteed Corp., Champion International, Collyer Insulated Wire Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA Co., Inc., DB Riley, Dana Corporation, Ericsson, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foseco, Inc., Foster-Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, General Refractories Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Gulf Belting & Gasket Co., Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Crane Company, Inc., Maremont Corp., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Mobil Oil Company, National Service Industries, Inc., North Brothers Company, Norton Company, Okonite Company, Okonite Incorporated, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Rapid American Corporation, Rayloc, Selby, Battersby & Co., Strafco, Uniroyal, Inc., Wagner Electric, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Zurn Industries, Inc., filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nelson, Scott)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DISMISSING PARTY U.C. Realty Corp without prejudice re: Notice #60 filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. (cmj)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER DISMISSING PARTY Louis M. Gerson Co., Inc. without prejudice re: Notice #62 filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. (cmj)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: #54 Notice of Dismissal filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. Plf's claims against Defendant Aearo Company 1 are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 5, 2011 Filing 88 International Paper Company's ANSWER to Complaint by Champion International. (Butts, Casey)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DISMISSING PARTY E. D. Bullard Company without prejudice re: Notice #57 filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. (cmj)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DISMISSING PARTY E.H. O'Neil Co without prejudice re: Notice #58 filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. (cmj)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: #63 Notice of Dismissal filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. It is ordered that all of the Plaintiff's claims against Defendant American Optical Corporation are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DISMISSING PARTY Jamestown Metal and Marine Sales without prejudice re: Notice #61 filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. (cmj)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DISMISSING PARTY Eastern Safety Equipment Co. a/k/a Aearo Company n/k/a Aearo Technologies LLC without prejudice re: Notice #55 filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. (cmj)
April 5, 2011 Filing 82 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO COMPUDYNE, INC., FORMERLY ROBINTECH, INC. D/B/A YORK SHIPLEY, INC. (Nelson, Scott)
April 5, 2011 Filing 81 NOTICE by A.W. Chesterton (McDonough, Edward)
April 5, 2011 Filing 80 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #67 filed by Standard Equipment Company, Inc. A review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
April 5, 2011 Filing 79 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #69 filed by A.W. Chesterton. A review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
April 5, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS A/K/A STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC. (Nelson, Scott)
April 5, 2011 Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Certainteed Corp.. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 5, 2011 Filing 76 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Certainteed Corp.. (Davis, Evelyn)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER on #48 , #49 , #51 , #52 , #53 , #67 , and #69 Corporate Disclosure Statements. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/5/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: #46 Notice of Dismissal filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. It is ordered that all of the Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Standard Equipment Company, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: #45 Notice of Dismissal filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. It is ordered that all of the Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Marine Specialty Company, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: #47 Notice of Dismissal filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. It is ORDERED that all of the Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Industrial Rubber and Specialty Company f/k/a Coastal Rubber & Gasket Co. are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 5, 2011 Filing 71 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #51 filed by Westinghouse Electric Corporation, CBS Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement #52 filed by Industrial Holdings Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement #48 filed by Standard Motor Products, Corporate Disclosure Statement #53 filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement #49 filed by National Service Industries, Inc. A review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
April 5, 2011 Filing 70 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by DB Riley. (Windham, Donald)
April 4, 2011 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant A.W. Chesterton. (McDonough, Edward)
April 4, 2011 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss by A.W. Chesterton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (McDonough, Edward)
April 4, 2011 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Standard Equipment Company, Inc.. (McDonough, Edward)
April 4, 2011 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Standard Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (McDonough, Edward)
April 4, 2011 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank E. Lankford, Jr on behalf of Bendix Foundation Brake Corporation (Lankford, Frank)
April 4, 2011 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank E. Lankford, Jr on behalf of Allied-Signal, Inc. (Lankford, Frank)
April 4, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION (Nelson, Scott)
April 4, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO LOUIS M. GERSON CO., INC. (Nelson, Scott)
April 4, 2011 Filing 61 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO JAMESTOWN METAL MARINE SALES, INC. (Nelson, Scott)
April 4, 2011 Filing 60 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO U.C. REALTY CORP., FORMERLY MHC HOLDING AND LAND CORPORATION, FORMERLY HOMECRAFTERS CENTERS, INC., FORMERLY MOORE-HANDLEY, INC. (Nelson, Scott)
April 4, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO REILLY-BENTON COMPANY, INC. (Nelson, Scott)
April 4, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO E. H. O'NEILL CO., INC. (Nelson, Scott)
April 4, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO E.D. BULLARD COMPANY (Nelson, Scott)
April 4, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss by E.D. Bullard Company. (Tyra, Bryan)
April 4, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO EASTERN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CO. A/K/A AEARO COMPANY N/K/A AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (Nelson, Scott)
April 4, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO AEARO COMPANY I, INC. F/K/A CABOT SAFETY CORPORATION N/K/A AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (Nelson, Scott)
April 1, 2011 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Partridge, Donald)
April 1, 2011 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Partridge, Donald)
April 1, 2011 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants CBS Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Harris, James)
April 1, 2011 Filing 50 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CBS Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Harris, James)
April 1, 2011 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant National Service Industries, Inc.. (House, James)
April 1, 2011 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Standard Motor Products. (House, James)
April 1, 2011 Filing 47 Notice of Dismissal Industrial Rubber & Specialty Company f/k/a Coastal Rubber & Gasket Co. by William M. Cunningham, Jr. (Nelson, Scott) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cmj).
April 1, 2011 Filing 46 Notice of Dismissal Standard Equipment Company, Incorporated by William M. Cunningham, Jr. (Nelson, Scott) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cmj).
April 1, 2011 Filing 45 Notice of Dismissal as to Marine Specialty Company, Inc. n/k/a MARSPEC Technical Products, Inc. by William M. Cunningham, Jr. (Nelson, Scott) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cmj).
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Thomas W. Tyner). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/31/11. (sdb)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 4/14/2011. Replies due by 4/21/2011. Motion to be taken under submission on 4/22/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/31/11. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 31, 2011 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company. (Harris, James)
March 31, 2011 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William M. Cunningham, Jr. Amchem Products, Inc. served on 3/26/2011, answer due 4/18/2011; Borg-Warner served on 3/28/2011, answer due 4/18/2011; Collyer Insulated Wire Company served on 3/28/2011, answer due 4/18/2011; General Refractories Company served on 3/28/2011, answer due 4/18/2011; North Brothers Company served on 3/26/2011, answer due 4/18/2011; Uniroyal, Inc. served on 3/28/2011, answer due 4/18/2011; Wagner Electric served on 3/26/2011, answer due 4/18/2011. (Nelson, Scott)
March 31, 2011 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Marine Specialty Company, Inc., National Service Industries, Inc., Standard Motor Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Partridge, Donald)
March 31, 2011 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William M. Cunningham, Jr. A.W. Chesterton served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Aearo Company 1 served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Allied-Signal, Inc. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; American Optical Corporation served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; Bendix Foundation Brake Corporation served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; CBS Corporation served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; Certainteed Corp. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Champion International served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Crown Cork & Seal USA Co., Inc. served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; DB Riley served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Dana Corporation served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; E.D. Bullard Company served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Eastern Safety Equipment Co., Aearo Corporation served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Ericsson, Inc. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Ford Motor Company served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Foseco, Inc. served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; Foster-Wheeler Corporation served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; General Electric Company served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Georgia-Pacific Corporation served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Gulf Belting & Gasket Co., Inc. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Honeywell International, Inc. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; IMO Industries, Inc. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Industrial Holdings Corporation served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Industrial Rubber and Specialty Company served on 3/15/2011, answer due 4/5/2011; Ingersoll-Rand Company served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Jamestown Metal and Marine Sales served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; John Crane Company, Inc. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Louis M. Gerson Company, Inc. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Maremont Corp. served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; Marine Specialty Company, Inc. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Mobil Oil Company served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; National Service Industries, Inc. served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; Norton Company served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Oglebay Norton Company served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Okonite Company served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Okonite Incorporated served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; Owens-Illinois, Inc. served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; Rapid American Corporation served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; Rayloc served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Reilly-Benton Company, Inc. served on 3/15/2011, answer due 4/5/2011; Selby, Battersby & Co. served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; Standard Equipment Company, Inc. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Standard Motor Products served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Strafco served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; U.C. Realty Corp. served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011; Westinghouse Electric Corporation served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011; Zurn Industries, Inc. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011. (Nelson, Scott)
March 30, 2011 Filing 39 MOTION for Thomas Tyner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mobil Oil Company. (Fee paid #20236) Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (cmj)
March 30, 2011 Filing 37 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #32 filed by IMO Industries, Inc. A review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
March 30, 2011 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Oglebay Norton Company. (Tubb, Jones)
March 28, 2011 Filing 35 Summons Reissued as to Cablec Corporation (Alias Summons). Note to Counsel: The Summons have been re-issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (sdb)
March 28, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by William M. Cunningham, Jr ALIAS SUMMONS (CABLEC) (Nelson, Scott)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER on #32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/28/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 28, 2011 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. (Helmsing, Frederick)
March 24, 2011 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Helmsing, Frederick)
March 24, 2011 Filing 30 Documents endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #25 filed by Mobil Oil Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement #22 filed by Honeywell International, Inc. A review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER on #22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/23/2011. (cmj)
March 24, 2011 Filing 27 Alias Summons Issued as to Borg-Warner, Collyer Insulated Wire Company, General Refractories Company, North Brothers Company, Uniroyal, Inc., Wagner Electric.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER on #25 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mobil Oil Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/23/2011. (cmj)
March 23, 2011 Filing 26 Alias Summons Issued as to Amchem Products, Inc... Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
March 23, 2011 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Mobil Oil Company, Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Corporation identifying Corporate Parent ExxonMobil Corporation, Corporate Parent Mobil Corporation for Mobil Oil Company.. (Eaton, Rocky)
March 23, 2011 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mobil Oil Company. (Eaton, Rocky)
March 23, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by William M. Cunningham, Jr (ALIAS SUMMONS) (Nelson, Scott)
March 23, 2011 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (Lankford, Frank)
March 23, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. of Tag Along Action (Lankford, Frank)
March 23, 2011 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Lankford, Frank)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order re: #10 Notice of [Partial] Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Certain Defendants filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. It is ORDERED that all of the Plf's claims against Defendant Uniroyal Fiber & Textile Division of Uniroyal, Inc. and Defendant Viacom, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/22/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 22, 2011 Filing 18 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #14 filed by John Crane Company, Inc. A review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
March 22, 2011 Filing 17 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Notice of Tag Along Action #12 filed by John Crane Company, Inc. (gcp)
March 22, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stewart D. McCloud on behalf of John Crane Company, Inc. (McCloud, Stewart)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by John Crane Company, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/22/2011. (cmj)
March 21, 2011 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant John Crane Company, Inc.. (Lankford, Frank)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/5/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/21/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 21, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE by John Crane Company, Inc. of Tag Along Action (Lankford, Frank)
March 21, 2011 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by John Crane Company, Inc.. (Lankford, Frank)
March 14, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr re #1 Complaint, RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Nelson, Scott)
March 14, 2011 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to A.W. Chesterton, Aearo Company 1, Allied-Signal, Inc., Amchem Products, Inc., American Optical Corporation, Bendix Foundation Brake Corporation, Borg-Warner, CBS Corporation, Cablec Corporation, Certainteed Corp., Champion International, Collyer Insulated Wire Company, Compudyne, Inc., Crown Cork & Seal USA Co., Inc., DB Riley, Dana Corporation, E.D. Bullard Company, E.H. O'Neil Co., Inc., Eastern Safety Equipment Co., Aearo Corporation, Ericsson, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foseco, Inc., Foster-Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, General Refractories Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Gulf Belting & Gasket Co., Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Industrial Rubber and Specialty Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Jamestown Metal and Marine Sales, John Crane Company, Inc., Louis M. Gerson Company, Inc., Maremont Corp., Marine Specialty Company, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Mobil Oil Company, National Service Industries, Inc., North Brothers Company, Norton Company, Oglebay Norton Company, Okonite Company, Okonite Incorporated, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Rapid American Corporation, Rayloc, Reilly-Benton Company, Inc., Selby, Battersby & Co., Standard Equipment Company, Inc., Standard Motor Products, Strafco, U.C. Realty Corp., Uniroyal, Inc., Wagner Electric, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Zurn Industries, Inc... Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: #7 Rule 41 Notice of Partial Dismissal filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr.. All of the Plaintiff's claims against the following 11 defendants are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice: Anchor Packing Company, Charter, Inc., Charter Consolidated, P.L.C., Charter Consolidated Finance Limited, Charter Consolidated Financial Services Limited, Charter Consolidated Investments Limited, Charter Consolidated Services Limited, Consolidated Mines Selection Company Limited, Insulation Engineers, Inc., Insulation Contracting, Inc. of Alabama, Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc.. Nothing herein shall be construed as dismissing any of the Plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/14/2011. Copies to parties. (sdb)
March 11, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE by William M. Cunningham, Jr re #1 Complaint, RULE 41(a)(1)(i) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Nelson, Scott)
March 11, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by William M. Cunningham, Jr CORRECTED (Nelson, Scott)
March 9, 2011 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Okonite Company.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
March 9, 2011 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to A.W. Chesterton, Aearo Company 1, Allied-Signal, Inc., Amchem Products, Inc., American Optical Corporation, Bendix Foundation Brake Corporation, Borg-Warner, CBS Corporation, Cablec Corporation, Certainteed Corp., Champion International, Collyer Insulated Wire Company, Compudyne, Inc., Crown Cork & Seal USA Co., Inc., DB Riley, Dana Corporation, E.D. Bullard Company, E.H. O'Neil Co., Inc., Eastern Safety Equipment Co., Aearo Corporation, Ericsson, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foseco, Inc., Foster-Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, General Refractories Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Gulf Belting & Gasket Co., Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Industrial Rubber and Specialty Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Jamestown Metal and Marine Sales, John Crane Company, Inc., Louis M. Gerson Company, Inc., Maremont Corp., Marine Specialty Company, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Mobil Oil Company, National Service Industries, Inc. North Brothers Company, Norton Company, Oglebay Norton Company, Okonite Inc., Standard Equipment Company, Inc... Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj) Modified on 3/9/2011 (cmj). Modified on 3/9/2011 (cmj).
March 9, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by William M. Cunningham, Jr (Nelson, Scott)
March 7, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by William M. Cunningham, Jr (Nelson, Scott) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/9/2011) (cmj).
December 3, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 1128-1019733, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by William M. Cunningham, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nelson, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2010: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M. Cunningham, Jr.
Represented By: Scott O. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Company 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal, Inc.
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bendix Foundation Brake Corporation
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amchem Products, Inc.
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Packing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton
Represented By: Edward B. McDonough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cablec Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: James A. Harris, III
Represented By: Nicole Mapp Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corp.
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion International
Represented By: Casey Lampkin Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Consolidated, P.L.c.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Consolidated Finance Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Consolidated Financial Services Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Consolidated Investments Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Consolidated Services Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collyer Insulated Wire Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compudyne, Inc. formerly Robintech, Inc., d/b/a York Shipley, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Mines Selection Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal USA Co., Inc.
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Represented By: Walter T. Gilmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Corporation
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Riley
Represented By: Donald Alan Windham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Safety Equipment Co., Aearo Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.D. Bullard Company
Represented By: Bryan Scott Tyra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.H. O'Neil Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foseco, Inc.
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Brooke Garner Malcom
Represented By: Suzanne Alldredge Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster-Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jenelle R. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Refractories Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Corporation
Represented By: C. Paul Cavender
Represented By: Allan R. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: William L. Waudby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Belting & Gasket Co., Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick George Helmsing, Jr.
Represented By: Brian P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Donald C. Partridge
Represented By: James G. House, III
Represented By: Laura DeVaughn Goodson
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Rubber and Specialty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Donald C. Partridge
Represented By: James G. House, III
Represented By: Laura DeVaughn Goodson
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insulation Engineers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insulation Contracting, Inc. of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamestown Metal and Marine Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Company, Inc.
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Represented By: Stewart W. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis M. Gerson Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maremont Corp.
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Specialty Company, Inc.
Represented By: Donald C. Partridge
Represented By: James G. House, III
Represented By: Laura DeVaughn Goodson
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Anthony Vercher
Represented By: Joi C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company
Represented By: James A. Harris, III
Represented By: Nicole Mapp Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Oil Company
Represented By: Rocky W. Eaton
Represented By: Thomas W. Tyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Service Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Donald C. Partridge
Represented By: James G. House, III
Represented By: Laura DeVaughn Goodson
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Brothers Company
Represented By: James G. House, III
Represented By: Laura DeVaughn Goodson
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norton Company
Represented By: Robert H. Sprain, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oglebay Norton Company
Represented By: Jones Glynn Tubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okonite Company
Represented By: Michael E. Turner
Represented By: Sydney F. Frazier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okonite Incorporated
Represented By: Michael E. Turner
Represented By: Sydney F. Frazier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony C. Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid American Corporation
Represented By: Emit Luther McCafferty, III
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayloc
Represented By: Robert F. Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selby, Battersby & Co. d/b/a S.B. Decking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Equipment Company, Inc.
Represented By: Edward B. McDonough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products
Represented By: Donald C. Partridge
Represented By: James G. House, III
Represented By: Laura DeVaughn Goodson
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strafco
Represented By: John A. Smyth, III
Represented By: Will Alan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.C. Realty Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: James G. House, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Fiber & Textire Division of Uniroyal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: James A. Harris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, Inc.
Represented By: William L. Waudby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagner Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?