Vision Bank v. FP Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Defendant: WB Property Management, LLC, Mobile Providence Property Management, LLC, FP Management, LLC, John F. Campbell and Mobile Midtown Property Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00003
Filed: January 4, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of Vision Bank against FP Management, LLC, Mobile Midtown Property Management, LLC, Mobile Providence Property Management, LLC, WB Property Management, LLC, John F. Campbell in the total amount of $26,282.79. Pos t-judgment interest is imposed pursuant to 28:1961, and shall accrue at 0.12 percent from the date of judgment is entered on the docket until this judgment is paid. Count Three of plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 01/31/2012. (mab)
January 25, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 43 Motion for Attorney Fees, and awarding attorneys' fees in the amount of $13,317.00 and costs in the amount of $350.00, for a total award of $13,667.00. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/25/2012. (mab)
December 13, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Vision Bank's 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counts One and Two. If Vision Bank does not intend to pursue the remedy alleged in Count Three, it should so inform the court. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/13/2011. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Bank v. FP Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WB Property Management, LLC
Represented By: James E. Bridges, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Providence Property Management, LLC
Represented By: James E. Bridges, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FP Management, LLC
Represented By: James E. Bridges, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Campbell
Represented By: James E. Bridges, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Midtown Property Management, LLC
Represented By: James E. Bridges, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Represented By: Archibald T. Reeves, IV
Represented By: Frederick George Helmsing, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?