Schambeau Properties, LP v. Waffle House, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Schambeau Properties, LP
Defendant: Waffle House, Inc., Sonic Restaurants, Inc. and Alabama Sound Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00029
Filed: January 14, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion to Alter, Vacate or Set Aside. The 79 Motion to Retax is moot. The 81 Amended Motion to Retax is granted, and its request for costs pursuant to the 80 Bill of Costs is granted in part and denied in part. Costs are hereby taxed against plaintiff and in favor of ASI in the total amount of$4,602.81. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/26/12. (tgw)
December 30, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alabama Sound Investments, Inc. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Alabama Sound Investments, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. All claims against defendant Sonic Restaurants, Inc. hav ing previously been dismissed, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate that entity as a defendant. All of Schambeau's claims asserted against fictitious defendants are dismissed without prejudice. This action will proceed to trial as to plaintiffs claims against defendant Waffle House, Inc., and Waffle House's third-party claims against GECI & Associates, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/30/2011. (tgw)
June 22, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 23 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint. Waffle House is ordered by 6/29/2011 to file as a freestanding document its Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/22/2011. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schambeau Properties, LP v. Waffle House, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waffle House, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent A. Noletto, Jr.
Represented By: Heather Marie Houston
Represented By: Craig Whitfield Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonic Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Sound Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Paul V. Lagarde
Represented By: Christina May Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schambeau Properties, LP
Represented By: John W. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?