Bowman v. CitiMortgage, Inc.

Plaintiff: John Bowman
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00047
Filed: January 28, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice per parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/29/12. (cmj)
October 31, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/31/2011. (cmj)
May 25, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that the Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal (Doc. 6) is GRANTED such that the Plaintiff's invasion of privacy, defamation, and wantonness claims are DISMISSED with pre judice; and that one basis for each of the Plaintiffs claims of negligence and breach of contract -- those expressly relying on alleged provision of inaccurate information to credit reporting agencies -- are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/25/2011. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. CitiMortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bowman
Represented By: John David Whetstone
Represented By: Barney A. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen James Bumgarner
Represented By: Edward D. Cotter
Represented By: Rik Stanford Tozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?