Graf et al v. Morgan et al

Plaintiff: Michael Scott Graf and Paula Graf
Defendant: Robert Lanier Morgan and Forest Products Transport, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00064
Filed: February 7, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Butler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING all claims in this matter W/PREJUDICE subject to the right of any party to reinstate those claims within 30 days of the date of this order should the settlement agreement not be consummated. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/23/2012. (tot)
March 13, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' 68 motion to amend pretrial disclosures, trial witness list and trial exhibit list, and denying plaintiffs' 73 motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/13/2012. (mab)
January 10, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.Defendants motion for summary judgment as to Counts Two andThree of the Complaint is hereby GRANTED.. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 1/10/2012. (adk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graf et al v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scott Graf
Represented By: Shane Thomas Sears
Represented By: James D. Sears
Represented By: Thomas E. Dasinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Graf
Represented By: Thomas E. Dasinger
Represented By: James D. Sears
Represented By: Shane Thomas Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lanier Morgan
Represented By: David Baker Hall
Represented By: Andrew Philip Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Products Transport, LLC
Represented By: David Baker Hall
Represented By: Andrew Philip Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?