Parker et al v. St. Paul Travelers

Plaintiff: Kenneth Parker, Jo Ann Parker, Spencer Dickey, W. D. Powers, Merle Kay Powers and Cora Clausen
Defendant: St. Paul Travelers
Case Number: 1:2011cv00066
Filed: February 8, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion to Vacate. The Court's order denying the defendants motion for summary judgment, (Doc. 60 ), is vacated and withdrawn. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/29/2011. (tgw)
November 21, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion to Ratify, Join or Substitute Party. This action shall proceed with Everett Clausen, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Cora Clausen, and with Elaine Dickey Isler, as the Administrator of the Last Will of Spencer Dickey, as parties plaintiff. The parties' future filings shall reflect this change. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/21/2011. (tgw)
August 1, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Dismiss the claims of Cora Clausen. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/1/2011. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker et al v. St. Paul Travelers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Parker
Represented By: John W. Parker
Represented By: John R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Parker
Represented By: John W. Parker
Represented By: John R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Dickey
Represented By: John W. Parker
Represented By: John R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. D. Powers
Represented By: John R. Parker
Represented By: John W. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merle Kay Powers
Represented By: John R. Parker
Represented By: John W. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Clausen
Represented By: John R. Parker
Represented By: John W. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Travelers
Represented By: Joel S. Isenberg
Represented By: Susan Haygood McCurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?