Dawson vs. Quaites

Plaintiff: Michael Dawson
Defendant: Katina R. Quaites
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Baronski Jackson-Lett and Katina R. Quaites
Cross_claimant: Katina R. Quaites
Cross_defendant: Michael Dawson
Thirdparty_defendant: Larry Lucas, Laura Hensley, Richard E. Chinoweth and Paul Wilson
Case Number: 1:2011cv00110
Filed: March 2, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Plf Michael Dawson against Dft Katina R. Quaites w/regard to Plf's state-law claim of assault & battery & state-law claim of negligence. Plf's state-law claim of outrage against Dft is DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE. Plf is awarded compensatory damages in the amount of $4,999.00 & punitive damages in the amount of $5,000.00. Costs are to be taxed against Dft. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/13/2012. (copy mailed to Dft Quaites on 9/14/12) (tot)
September 29, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dft Quaites' 27 Motion to Stay as set out. This matter is STAYED pending resolution of the felony indictment pending against Ms. Quaites. This action is to be placed on the court's administrative docket. Upon receipt of written notification from the parties that the Baldwin Co. Circuit Ct. case against Ms. Quaites has been resolved, the stay will be lifted, & this case will be referred to the mag. judge for entry for entry of an amended scheduling order. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/29/11. (tot)
July 6, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as set out. Plf Dawson's 6 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/6/2011. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson vs. Quaites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katina R. Quaites
Represented By: Algernon Johnson Cooper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Baronski Jackson-Lett
Represented By: Algernon Johnson Cooper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Katina R. Quaites
Represented By: Algernon Johnson Cooper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Katina R. Quaites
Represented By: Algernon Johnson Cooper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dawson
Represented By: William E. Scully, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Michael Dawson
Represented By: William E. Scully, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Larry Lucas
Represented By: Gabrielle E. Reeves
Represented By: John Chas. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Laura Hensley
Represented By: John Chas. Pierce
Represented By: Gabrielle E. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Richard E. Chinoweth
Represented By: Carl E. Freman
Represented By: Melissa Gail Pigg
Represented By: Andrew John Rutens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Paul Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?