Robinson et al v. Ryla Teleservices, Inc.

Plaintiff: Chasity Robinson and Makelia Wingard
Defendant: Ryla Teleservices, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00131
Filed: March 15, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES. Due to Plaintiff Makelia Wingard's failure to comply with this Court's Orders (Docs. 174 , 177 ), and failure to prosecute this action, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Makelia Wingard's FLSA claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/26/2013. Certified copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff Makelia Wingard. (Certified Mail Receipt # 7011 0470 0002 4366 2423) (sdb)
December 21, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion to Certify Class as set out; granting 105 Motion to Supplement; the Court denies the plaintiffs' request to send a reminder letter/notice. Within 14 days from the close of the opt-in period, the parties shall meet and confer and file a supplemental Rule 26(f) report, substantially similar to the report they submitted on June 13, 2011, setting forth a proposed schedule for the efficient resolution of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/20/2011. (cmj)
September 29, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Individual Plaintiff Makelia Wingard. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/29/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Ryla Teleservices, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryla Teleservices, Inc.
Represented By: Malvern U. Griffin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasity Robinson
Represented By: David E. Schlesinger
Represented By: James H. Kaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makelia Wingard
Represented By: James H. Kaster
Represented By: David E. Schlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?