Gross-Jones v. Mercy Medical

Plaintiff: Nicole Gross-Jones
Defendant: Mercy Medical
Case Number: 1:2011cv00132
Filed: March 15, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2012 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 99 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/3/2012. (tgw)
June 26, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/26/2012. (tgw)
June 11, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/11/2012. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross-Jones v. Mercy Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Gross-Jones
Represented By: Temple DeAnna Trueblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Medical
Represented By: Cecily L. Kaffer
Represented By: Paul D. Myrick
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Rehm
Represented By: Matthew Taylor Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?