Howington v. Smurfit-Stone Container Corporation/Smurfit-Stone Container Corporation Pension Plan for Hourly Employees

Plaintiff: James E. Howington, Jr.
Defendant: Smurfit-Stone Container Corporation/Smurfit-Stone Container Corporation Pension Plan for Hourly Employees
Case Number: 1:2011cv00136
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Smurfit-Stone Container Corporation/Smurfit-Stone Container Corporation Pension Plan for Hourly Employees against James E. Howington, Jr.. It is ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/30/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 12, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: non-jury trial on 4/3/12. The decision is reversed and remanded to the Plan Administrator for further consideration and investigation as to Howington's onset of disability. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/12/2012. (sdb)
February 13, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Strike; denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/13/12. (sdb)
December 7, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/7/2011. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howington v. Smurfit-Stone Container Corporation/Smurfit-Stone Container Corporation Pension Plan for Hourly Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Howington, Jr.
Represented By: John L. Jernigan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smurfit-Stone Container Corporation/Smurfit-Stone Container Corporation Pension Plan for Hourly Employees
Represented By: Kristin Taylor Ashworth
Represented By: John J. Coleman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?