Hand Arendall, LLC v. Joiner
Plaintiff: Hand Arendall, LLC
Defendant: Murray E. Joiner, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00150
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JUDGMENT in favor of Hand Arendall, LLC against Murray E. Joiner, Jr. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/20/2012. (cmj)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER. The Court finds in favor of Hand Arendall on Count One of its complaint for breach of contract. The Court is unable to determine the total fees. Hand Arendall has until 9/7/12 to amend their request for damages, with explanation, to conform to the Court's factual findings. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/31/2012. (cmj)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. The motions to strike contained within the parties' summary judgment pleadings are denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/5/2012. (cmj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hand Arendall, LLC v. Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray E. Joiner, Jr.
Represented By: Craig Whitfield Goolsby
Represented By: Faith Ann Pate Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hand Arendall, LLC
Represented By: Jack Smalley, III
Represented By: W. Alexander Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?