Cromwell v. Safetynet Youth Systems, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Michael W. Cromwell
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Co. and SafetyNet Youth Systems, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00155
Filed: March 30, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING all claims in this case W/PREJUDICE as set out. Any party may move for reinstatement within the next 60 days should settlement not be consummated. Each party shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/27/2011. (tot)
July 26, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, parties are to file their Report of Parties' Planning Meeting on or before 8/3/2011 & SHOW CAUSE for their failure to comply w/the deadline established in order of 5/19/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/26/2011. (tot)
July 7, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting 5 MOTION to Realign Parties, and denying 12 MOTION to Remand. Defendant Safetynet Youth Systems, LLC is re-aligned as a party plaintiff. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/7/2011. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cromwell v. Safetynet Youth Systems, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Cromwell
Represented By: Calvin Carter Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Co.
Represented By: Keith J. Pflaum
Represented By: Larry W. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafetyNet Youth Systems, LLC
Represented By: Rosemary S. Moore
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?