Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Imagine CBQ, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: Bonnie L. Rieman, Joseph Laney, Imagine CBQ, LLC, Imagine Enterprises, LLC, Frances W. Hopkins, Joseph Overton, S. Beck Weathers and Margaret O. Weathers
Case Number: 1:2011cv00168
Filed: April 5, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 75 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 75 Motion to Vacate as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/10/2012. (cmj)
June 4, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Branch Banking and Trust Company against Imagine CBQ, LLC, Imagine Enterprises, LLC, Bonnie L. Rieman, Frances W. Hopkins, Joseph Overton, Margaret O. Weathers, S. Beck Weathers. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/1/2012. (cmj)
April 13, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 BBT's Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Document 35 is withdrawn and doc. 33 is granted. BBT to file an itemization of hours, etc. and supplement the record to establish damages, etc. by 4/19/12; defendants may respond by 4/26/12. The claim for attorneys fees will be taken under submission 4/27/12. BBT may file a reply by 5/3/12 to the response regarding damages. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/12/2012. (cmj)
February 28, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PARTY re: re: Notice of Dismissal as to Joseph H. Laney ) 62 filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. Defendant Laney is dismissed without prejudice.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/28/2012. (cmj)
January 19, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 53 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company for reasons set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/19/2012. (cmj)
November 16, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Amend Complaint with instruction that Branch Banking properly allege citizenship as set out. The amended complaint should be filed on or before 11/30/11. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/16/2011. (cmj)
November 7, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot 32 Motion to Amend/Correct Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice to the ability of these defendants to re-file same should Judge Kristi K. DuBose deny plaintiff's unopposed 36 Motion for leave to amend its complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/7/2011. copies to parties (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Imagine CBQ, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie L. Rieman
Represented By: Max Cassady, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imagine CBQ, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imagine Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances W. Hopkins
Represented By: Max Cassady, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Overton
Represented By: Max Cassady, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Beck Weathers
Represented By: Britta Erin Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret O. Weathers
Represented By: Britta Erin Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Richard A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?