Foster v. Bridgestone Americas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah B. Foster
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, Bridgestone Americas Holding, Inc., Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire, LLC, Bridgestone, Mazda Motor Corp., Ford Motor Company and Mazda Motor of America, Inc. doing business as Mazda North American Operations
Not Yet Classified: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv00175
Filed: April 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Order: All claims and issues joined between plaintiff and the Mazda defendants have been settled and compromised. There being no remaining defendants and no remaining claims, this action has been settled in its entirety. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/6/2013. (tgw)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Order re: #216 MOTION for Leave to File amended answers filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Mazda Motor Corp. Responses due by 5/7/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/3/2013. (tgw)
May 2, 2013 Filing 220 RESPONSE in Opposition re #190 MOTION in Limine and Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion in Limine filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually), Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Smith, Hugh)
May 2, 2013 Filing 219 RESPONSE in Opposition re #183 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Testimony of Defendant Mazda's Previously Undisclosed Witnesses filed by Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
May 2, 2013 Filing 218 RESPONSE in Opposition re #194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude and/or Alternatively, for Sanctions Regarding Previously Undisclosed Evidence from Defendant Mazda filed by Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
May 2, 2013 Filing 217 RESPONSE in Opposition re #185 MOTION in Limine to Prevent Improper Statements During Opening or Otherwise by Defense Counsel and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
May 2, 2013 Filing 216 MOTION for Leave to File amended answers by Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Wyatt, James)
May 2, 2013 Filing 215 RESPONSE in Opposition re #186 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Remarks Relating to Counsel for Plaintiff and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
May 2, 2013 Filing 214 RESPONSE in Opposition re #187 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Statements that Witnesses Utilize Bridgestone Tires or Drive Mazda Vehicles and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
May 2, 2013 Filing 213 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Smith, Hugh)
May 2, 2013 Filing 212 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster) re #194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude and/or Alternatively, for Sanctions Regarding Previously Undisclosed Evidence from Defendant Mazda Notice of Scrivener's Error (Smith, Hugh)
May 1, 2013 Filing 211 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster) Notice of Intent to Offer Exhibits Pursuant to Rule 807 (Smith, Hugh)
May 1, 2013 Filing 210 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster) Notice of Non-Objection to Magistrate Selecting Jury (Smith, Hugh)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Order striking the #191 Objections to List of Deposition Designations, #192 Objections to Exhibit List & #193 Objections to Witness List. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/1/2013. (tgw)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER finding as moot the following motions: #170 Motion for Order/Judgment; #184 Motion in Limine; #197 Motion to Bifurcate; #198 Motion in Limine; #199 Motion in Limine; #200 Motion in Limine; #201 Motion in Limine; #202 Motion in Limine; #203 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/1/2013. (tgw)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Order entered that all claims and issues joined between plaintiff and defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, have been settled and compromised. It is ordered that Plaintiff's claims against Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/1/2013. (tgw)
May 1, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Telephone Conference re settlement held on 5/1/2013. (srr)
April 30, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Settlement Conference held on 4/30/2013. (srr)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Order: The settlement conference held on 4/29/2013 was suspended and will resume (telephonically) at 10:00 a.m. on 5/1/2013. In the event this matter does not settle, the deadline for responses to pending motions in limine & the motion to bifurcate is continued to 5/2/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/29/2013. (tgw)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER finding as moot #171 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Cottles Regarding any Tire Recall or Replacement Program. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/25/2013. (tgw)
April 23, 2013 Filing 203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Trooper Fillingim and Portions of the Police Reports by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition of Cameron Fillingim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Accident Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Technicial Assist, #4 Exhibit 4 - Offense Report) (Perry, Kenneth)
April 23, 2013 Filing 202 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or, in the Alternative, Motion in Limine regarding the Mazda Voluntary Replacement Program and Brief in Support Thereof by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition of T.Cottles, #2 Exhibit 2 - Owner Notification Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Brian J. Queiser, #4 Exhibit 4 - NHTSA Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Deposition of T.Cottles (Johnson matter), #6 Exhibit 6 - Deposition of T.Cottles (Werner matter)) (Perry, Kenneth)
April 23, 2013 Filing 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Dissimilar Tires by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Brian J. Queiser) (Perry, Kenneth)
April 23, 2013 Filing 200 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Dissimilar Accidents by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Answers to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of T.Cottles, #3 Exhibit C - NHTSA Report) (Perry, Kenneth)
April 23, 2013 Filing 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Foreign Events and Accidents by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Brian J. Queiser, #2 Exhibit B - Bridgestone Americas Surveys, #3 Exhibit C - Bridgestone Americas Surveys, #4 Exhibit D - Order (Hernandez matter), #5 Exhibit E - Hearing Transcript (Clayton matter)) (Perry, Kenneth)
April 23, 2013 Filing 198 MOTION in Limine by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition of T.Cottles) (Perry, Kenneth)
April 23, 2013 Filing 197 MOTION to Bifurcate by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Perry, Kenneth)
April 23, 2013 Filing 196 REPLY to Response to Motion #170 to Exclude Testimony of Troy Cottles filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition of T.Cottles (Veliz matter), #2 Exhibit 2 - Daubert Hearing Transcript (Campbell matter), #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of T.Cottles (Saucier matter)) (Perry, Kenneth)
April 23, 2013 Filing 195 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence or Argument Pertaining to Spare Tires, Pertaining to the Most Common Cause of Tire Failure, and Pertaining to Tread Pieces on the Highway and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01) (Smith, Hugh)
April 23, 2013 Filing 194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude and/or Alternatively, for Sanctions Regarding Previously Undisclosed Evidence from Defendant Mazda by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 02, #3 Exhibit 03, #4 Exhibit 04) (Smith, Hugh)
April 23, 2013 Filing 193 (Stricken per #209 Order) Objection to plaintiff's witness list. (Wyatt, James)
April 23, 2013 Filing 192 (Stricken per #209 Order) Objection to plaintiff's exhibit lists. (Wyatt, James)
April 23, 2013 Filing 191 (Stricken per #209 Order) Objection to plaintiff's deposition designations. (Wyatt, James)
April 23, 2013 Filing 190 MOTION in Limine and Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion in Limine by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief) (Wyatt, James)
April 23, 2013 Filing 189 MOTION to Bifurcate by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
April 23, 2013 Filing 188 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Alleged Compliance with Federal Motor Vehicles Safety Standards {FMVSS) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Smith, Hugh)
April 23, 2013 Filing 187 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Statements that Witnesses Utilize Bridgestone Tires or Drive Mazda Vehicles and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Smith, Hugh)
April 23, 2013 Filing 186 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Remarks Relating to Counsel for Plaintiff and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Smith, Hugh)
April 23, 2013 Filing 185 MOTION in Limine to Prevent Improper Statements During Opening or Otherwise by Defense Counsel and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Smith, Hugh)
April 23, 2013 Filing 184 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Assertation by Bridgestone that the Subject Tire was Built to the State of the Art and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Smith, Hugh)
April 23, 2013 Filing 183 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Testimony of Defendant Mazda's Previously Undisclosed Witnesses by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Smith, Hugh)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER ON PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Jury Selection set for 5/7/2013 08:45 AM in Courtroom 2A before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Jury Trial set for 5/13/2013 08:45 AM in Courtroom 2A before Chief Judge William H. Steele (ETT 8 days). Jury Charges Deadline set for 5/6/2013 Motions in Limine & Motion to Bifurcate are due by 4/23/2013, with responses due 4/30/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/16/2013. (tgw)
April 16, 2013 Filing 181 RESPONSE in Opposition re #170 MOTION for Order/Judgment Excluding Expert Opinions of Troy Cottles filed by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 02, #3 Exhibit 03, #4 Exhibit 04, #5 Exhibit 05, #6 Exhibit 06, #7 Exhibit 07, #8 Exhibit 08, #9 Exhibit 09, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (Smith, Hugh)
April 16, 2013 Filing 180 RESPONSE to Motion re: #171 MOTION for Order/Judgment Excluding any Testimony by Troy Cottles Regarding Any Tire Recall or Replacement Program Plaintiff Response to Bridgestone's Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert, Troy Cottles, Opinions on Sufficiency of Recall Program filed by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Smith, Hugh)
April 16, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William H. Steele: Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/16/2013. Trial scheduled for 5/13/13. ETT eight (8) days. Court Reporter chambers. (mbp)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ENDORSED ORDER granting #178 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/15/2013. (Steele, William)
April 12, 2013 Filing 178 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Pretrial Conference by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Smith, Hugh)
April 11, 2013 Filing 177 Objection re: #176 Joint Proposed Pretrial Order Objections to Plaintiff's and Mazda's Voir Dire. (Perry, Kenneth) Modified on 4/12/2013 (tgw).
April 11, 2013 Filing 176 Joint Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Pretrial Report by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster), Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit) (Wyatt, James) Modified on 4/12/2013 (tgw).
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Order setting a Settlement Conference for 4/29/2013 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/10/2013. (tgw)
April 10, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Telephone Conference re: settlement held on 4/10/2013. (srr)
April 9, 2013 Filing 174 Exhibit List Plaintiff Notice of Filing Amended Trial Exhibit List by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster).. (Smith, Hugh)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order re: #170 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Troy Cottles & #171 MOTION to Exclude any Testimony by Troy Cottles Regarding Any Tire Recall or Replacement Program filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. Responses due by 4/16/2013, Replies due by 4/23/2014. To the extent any party's exhibits exceed 50 pages, a courtesy hard copy must be delivered to chambers by 4/25/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/4/2013. (tgw)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Order granting in part denying in part #135 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp. All claims against Ford Motor Company are dismissed with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Ford as a party defendant. The #138 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert, Troy Cottles is moot. The #149 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Summary Judgment Affidavit is granted & portions of the affidavit are stricken as set out. The #156 MOTION to Strike the #155 Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority is granted. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/3/2013. (tgw)
April 2, 2013 Filing 171 MOTION for Order/Judgment Excluding any Testimony by Troy Cottles Regarding Any Tire Recall or Replacement Program by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Perry, Kenneth)
April 2, 2013 Filing 170 MOTION for Order/Judgment Excluding Expert Opinions of Troy Cottles by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Perry, Kenneth)
April 2, 2013 Filing 169 Exhibit List Notice of Filing Exhibit List by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster).. (Smith, Hugh)
April 1, 2013 Filing 168 RESPONSE to #156 MOTION to Strike #155 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority or, Alternatively, Motion for Leave to file Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01) (Smith, Hugh)
March 27, 2013 Filing 167 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Position Regarding Settlement #166 filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp. (jsc)
March 26, 2013 Filing 166 Joint Position Regarding Settlement filed by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Mazda Motor Corp.. (Wyatt, James)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are to file a Settlement Position statement by 4/1/2013. The parties must also show cause for their noncompliance with this Scheduling Order deadline. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/26/2013. (sdb)
March 26, 2013 Filing 164 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster) re #158 Notice (Other), Notice of Filing Second Amended Attachment 11 to Plaintiff Pretrial Disclosures (Smith, Hugh)
March 25, 2013 Filing 163 Exhibit List by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations.. (Perry, Kenneth)
March 25, 2013 Filing 162 Designation of Deposition Parts . (Perry, Kenneth)
March 25, 2013 Filing 161 Witness List by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Perry, Kenneth)
March 25, 2013 Filing 160 Exhibit List and pre-trial disclosures by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc... (Wyatt, James)
March 25, 2013 Filing 159 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster) re #158 Notice (Other), Notice of Filing Amended Attachment 11 to Plaintiff's Pretrial Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - Amended) (Smith, Hugh)
March 25, 2013 Filing 158 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster) Notice of Serving Pretrial Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (Smith, Hugh)
March 21, 2013 Filing 157 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster) Plaintiff's Notice of Serving Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Smith, Hugh)
March 21, 2013 Filing 156 MOTION to Strike #155 Notice (Other) by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
March 20, 2013 Filing 155 (Stricken per #172 Order) NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster) Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Summary Judgment (Smith, Hugh)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC as further set out. Count II of the Amended Complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff's claims against this defendant will proceed to trial with respect to Counts I and III. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/8/2013. (jlr)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Order granting #136 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. All of plaintiff's claims and causes of action against defendant Bridgestone Americas, Inc., f/k/a Bridgestone Americas Holding, Inc., are dismissed. Bridgestone Americas, Inc. terminated. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/5/2013. (sdb)
February 1, 2013 Filing 152 REPLY to #150 Response, PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Smith, Hugh)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Order directing the parties by 2/13/2013 to deliver to chambers a complete set of hard copies of all electronically filed summary judgment materials. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/1/2013. (tgw)
January 29, 2013 Filing 150 RESPONSE to #149 MOTION to Strike #147 Reply Brief, #135 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion to Strike Defendant's Summary Judgment Affidavit & Reply Brief or Alternatively, Objection to Inadmissible Evidence Pursuant to Rule 56(c)(2) filed by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
January 23, 2013 Filing 149 MOTION to Strike #147 Reply Brief, #135 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion to Strike Defendant's Summary Judgment Affidavit & Reply Brief or Alternatively, Objection to Inadmissible Evidence Pursuant to Rule 56(c)(2) by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Smith, Hugh)
January 16, 2013 Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion #133 filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Perry, Kenneth)
January 16, 2013 Filing 147 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc. re: #135 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7) (Wyatt, James)
January 3, 2013 Filing 146 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Deborah B. Foster(individually) re: #145 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Smith, Hugh)
January 2, 2013 Filing 145 RESPONSE in Opposition re #135 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit No. 1, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit No. 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit No. 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit No. 4) (Smith, Hugh)
January 2, 2013 Filing 144 RESPONSE to Motion re: #133 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response to Bridgestone Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Smith, Hugh)
December 26, 2012 Filing 143 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster(individually) re #136 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION (Smith, Hugh)
December 26, 2012 Filing 142 RESPONSE to Motion re: #138 MOTION to Strike the deposition testimony of plaintiff's expert, Troy Cottles RESPONSE TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE CERTAIN TESTIMONY OF EXPERT TROY COTTLES filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Smith, Hugh)
December 10, 2012 Filing 141 Attorney Letter re: ECF Registration mailed to Marc Jordan Semago; Attorney to comply by 12/19/2012. (tgw)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order re: #136 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bridgestone Americas, Inc. & #138 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp. Responses due by 12/27/2012, Replies due by 1/7/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/10/2012. Copy mailed to Marc Semago. (tgw)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Order on #133 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #135 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 1/2/2013. Replies to Response to S/J due by 1/16/2013. Motion to be taken under submission on 1/16/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/7/2012. (sdb)
December 5, 2012 Filing 138 MOTION to Strike the deposition testimony of plaintiff's expert, Troy Cottles by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b) (Wyatt, James)
December 5, 2012 Filing 137 Brief filed by Bridgestone Americas, Inc. re #136 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Perry, Kenneth)
December 5, 2012 Filing 136 MOTION to Dismiss by Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Perry, Kenneth)
December 5, 2012 Filing 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order) (Wyatt, James)
December 5, 2012 Filing 134 Brief filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations re #133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Perry, Kenneth)
December 5, 2012 Filing 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Perry, Kenneth)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ENDORSED ORDER denying #128 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/5/2012. (Nelson, Katherine)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ENDORSED ORDER granting #130 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/5/2012. (Nelson, Katherine)
December 5, 2012 Filing 130 MOTION for Marc Jordan Semago to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1363374, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Deborah B. Foster(individually), Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Attachments: #1 Application For Admission To Practice) (Lane, Joseph)
December 5, 2012 Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion #128 for Modification of discovery deadlines filed by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
December 3, 2012 Filing 128 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order #121 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,, by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Attachments: #1 Motion for Modification of Discovery Completion Deadline Relating to Expert Depositions Only and To Compel Expert Deposition Dates) (Smith, Hugh)
November 21, 2012 Filing 127 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Discovery filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually), Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Attachments: #1 NTD Mike Klima, #2 NTD Tom Giapponi, #3 NTD Joe Grant) (Lane, Joseph)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ENDORSED ORDER granting #125 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/13/2012. (Nelson, Katherine)
November 13, 2012 Filing 125 MOTION for Marc R. Brosseau to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1355402, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Brosseau, Marc)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ENDORSED ORDER granting #123 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/6/2012. (jsc)
November 5, 2012 Filing 123 MOTION for Scott G. Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1352189, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Edwards, Scott)
October 30, 2012 Filing 122 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Alexander Wyatt, III (Wyatt, James)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #120 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order: Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2013 09:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Discovery cutoff 11/21/2012. Motions due by 12/5/2012. Jury Selection set for 5/7/2013 08:45 AM in Courtroom 2A before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Trial to be set during the month of May 2013. Position Regarding Settlement due by 11/21/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/31/2012. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (tgw)
July 19, 2012 Filing 120 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Deadlines by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Smith, Hugh)
May 9, 2012 Filing 119 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster) Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure of Expert Testimony (Smith, Hugh)
May 4, 2012 Filing 118 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster) Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure of Expert Testimony (Smith, Hugh)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #116 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Certain Deadlines: Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2013 11:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Discovery cutoff 8/21/2012. Motions due by 8/31/2012. Jury Selection set for 2/5/2013 08:45 AM in Courtroom 2A before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Trial to be set during the month of February 2013. Position Regarding Settlement due by 8/21/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/3/2012. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (tgw)
May 1, 2012 Filing 116 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Certain Deadlines by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Perry, Kenneth)
March 30, 2012 Filing 115 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Mazda Motor of America, Inc. filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Smith, Hugh)
March 30, 2012 Filing 114 Notice of Filing First Request for Production to Ford Motor Company filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Smith, Hugh)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/16/2012. (tgw)
March 14, 2012 Filing 112 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Agreed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - MDL Protective Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Agreement executed by H.Smith, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Redline document) (Perry, Kenneth)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying #110 Motion for Protective Order with leave to file a joint motion for protective order addressing the instant case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/12/2012. (mbp)
March 5, 2012 Filing 110 MOTION for Protective Order by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Davis, Summer)
February 20, 2012 Filing 109 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Second RFP to Def. BATO filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually), Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Lane, Joseph)
February 6, 2012 Filing 108 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Responses to Def. Bridgestone's Second Set of RFP filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually), Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Lane, Joseph)
February 6, 2012 Filing 107 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Answers to Def. Bridgestone Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually), Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Lane, Joseph)
February 3, 2012 Filing 106 AMENDED ANSWER to by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Perry, Kenneth)
February 3, 2012 Filing 105 AMENDED ANSWER to by Mazda Motor Corp.. (Wyatt, James)
February 3, 2012 Filing 104 AMENDED ANSWER to by Ford Motor Company. (Wyatt, James)
February 3, 2012 Filing 103 AMENDED ANSWER to by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order granting #92 MOTION to Amend Answer filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations and granting #94 MOTION to Amend Answer filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc. Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp. The parties are ordered by 2/6/2012 to file their Amended Answers. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/30/12. (tgw)
January 25, 2012 Filing 101 REPLY to #97 Response to Motion, filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Davis, Summer)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order re: #99 Status Report Relating to Efforts to Serve Mazda Motor Corporation filed by Deborah B. Foster. Mazda Motor Corporation having appeared and therebeing no further issues presented regarding service of process on that defendant, plaintiff is hereby relieved of the obligation to make monthly status reports. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/25/2012. (tgw)
January 24, 2012 Filing 99 STATUS REPORT January 2012 Relating to Efforts to Serve Mazda Motor Corporation Pursuant to Hauge Convention in Compliance with August 15,2011 Court Order by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Smith, Hugh)
January 13, 2012 Filing 98 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Amended Answer by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, Bridgestone Americas, Inc. re #92 MOTION to Amend Answer #72 Answer to Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Answer) (Perry, Kenneth) Modified on 1/13/2012 (tgw).
January 12, 2012 Filing 97 RESPONSE to Motion re: #92 MOTION to Amend Answer #72 Answer to Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Response to Bridgestone's Motion for Leave of Court to File Amended Answer filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Hugh)
January 12, 2012 Filing 96 RESPONSE to Motion re: #94 MOTION to Amend Answer Plaintiff's Response to Mazda's Motion for Leave of Court to File Amended Answer filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Hugh)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order re: #94 MOTION to Amend Answer filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp. Responses due by 1/20/2012, Replies due by 1/25/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/11/2012. (tgw)
January 10, 2012 Filing 94 MOTION to Amend Answer by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Wyatt, James)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Order re: #92 MOTION to Amend Answer filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. Movant is ordered by 1/13/2012 to supplement their Motion (as set out). Responses to the motion are due by 1/20/2012, Replies due by 1/25/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/9/2012. (tgw)
January 6, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION to Amend Answer #72 Answer to Amended Complaint by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Excerpts of Deposition of Deborah Foster, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Email Correspondence) (Perry, Kenneth)
December 16, 2011 Filing 91 STATUS REPORT Plaintiff December 2011 Status Report Relatig to Efforts to Serve mazda Motor Corporation Pursuant to Hague Convention in Compliance with August 15, 2011 Court Order by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Smith, Hugh)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting in part the #89 Amended MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order: Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2012 10:30 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Jury Selection set for 10/30/2012 08:45 AM in Courtroom 2A before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Trial to be set during the month of November 2012. Discovery cutoff 7/2/2012. Motions due by 7/16/2012. Position Regarding Settlement due by 7/2/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/14/2011. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (tgw)
December 14, 2011 Filing 89 Amended MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order #88 Unopposed MOTION Modification of Discovery Deadlines re #52 Scheduling Order,, by All Plaintiffs. (Lane, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION Modification of Discovery Deadlines re #52 Scheduling Order,, by All Plaintiffs. (Lane, Joseph)
December 12, 2011 Filing 87 Mazda Motor Corporation's ANSWER to #66 Amended Complaint filed by the plaintiff by Mazda Motor Corp.. (Wyatt, James)
December 1, 2011 Filing 86 Objection to Bridgestone Americas, Inc.'s Subpoena to Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Allstate Insurance Company) (Haggard, Michael)
November 28, 2011 Filing 85 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Status Report #84 filed by Deborah B. Foster. (Steele, William)
November 21, 2011 Filing 84 STATUS REPORT November 2011 Relating to Efforts to Serve Mazda Motor Corporation Pursuant to Hague Convention in Compliance with August 15, 2011 Court Order by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Smith, Hugh)
October 24, 2011 Filing 83 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Status Report #82 filed by Deborah B. Foster. (Steele, William)
October 21, 2011 Filing 82 STATUS REPORT October 2011 Relating to Efforts to Serve Mazda Motor Corporation Pursuant to the Hague Convention in Compliance with August 15,2011 Court Order by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Smith, Hugh)
October 6, 2011 Filing 81 Notice of Filing Answers to Ford Motor Company's First Interrogatories to Plaintiff filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Smith, Hugh)
October 6, 2011 Filing 80 Notice of Filing Plaintiffs Responses to Ford and Mazda's First RFP to Plaintiff filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually), Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Lane, Joseph)
September 26, 2011 Filing 79 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Status Report #78 filed by Deborah B. Foster. (Steele, William)
September 23, 2011 Filing 78 STATUS REPORT September 2011 Relating to Efforts to Serve Mazda Mortor Corporation Pursuant to Hague Convention in Compliance with August 15, 2011 Court Order by Deborah B. Foster(individually). (Smith, Hugh)
August 26, 2011 Filing 77 Summons Issued as to Mazda Motor Corp....... Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
August 26, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster) (Smith, Hugh)
August 24, 2011 Filing 75 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Status Report #74 filed by Deborah B. Foster. (Steele, William)
August 23, 2011 Filing 74 STATUS REPORT (August 2011) Relating to Efforts to Serve Mazda Motor Corporation Pursuant to Hague Convention in Compliance with August 15, 2011 Court Order by Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Smith, Hugh)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient process and insufficient service of process filed by Mazda Motor Corp. The motion is granted insofar as service was defective and is due to be quashed, but is denied as to the dismissal of plaintiff's claims for insufficient service. Plaintiff's purported service of process on Mazda Motor Corporation via its American subsidiary is quashed. Plaintiff is ordered to file monthly status reports re: service on Mazda Motor Corp. on the fourth Tuesday of each month, beginning in August 2011. First status report due by 8/23/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/15/2011. (tgw)
July 29, 2011 Filing 72 ANSWER to #66 Amended Complaint by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Perry, Kenneth)
July 29, 2011 Filing 71 AMENDED ANSWER to plaintiff's 1st amended complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Wyatt, James)
July 29, 2011 Filing 70 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time pursuant to Rule 6(b), Fed.R.Civ.P. The Amended Complaint #66 filed by plaintiff on July 15, 2011, contemporaneously with her Motion for Extension, will be accepted, notwithstanding its slightly tardy submission. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/20/2011. Copies to parties. (mpp)
July 18, 2011 Filing 68 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Wyatt, James)
July 18, 2011 Filing 67 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
July 15, 2011 Filing 66 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Deborah B. Foster(individually), Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Lane, Joseph)
July 15, 2011 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Deborah B. Foster(individually), Deborah B. Foster(Adminstrator of the estate of Larry Foster). (Lane, Joseph)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Amend Answer - defendants Mazda Motor of Americaand Ford are NLT 7/22/11 to file as freestanding pleadings their Amended Answers. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/15/2011. Copies to parties. (mpp)
July 8, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION to Amend Answer #15 Answer to Complaint, #16 Answer to Complaint by Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MNAO's amended answer and Ford's amended answer) (Wyatt, James)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Amend Complaint NLT 7/14/11 and GRANTING the #61 Motion to to Drop Deborah B. Foster, as an Individual Plaintiff. All claims brought by Foster in her individual capacity are deemed withdrawn and are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/7/2011. Copies to parties on 7/8/11. (mpp)
July 6, 2011 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Deborah Foster as an Individual Plaintiff by Deborah B. Foster. (Smith, Hugh)
July 6, 2011 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by Deborah B. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Hugh)
July 6, 2011 Filing 59 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Mazda Motor Corp. re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient process and insufficient service of process pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) of the Fed. R. Civ. P., Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Mazda Motor Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint as exhibit 1 to MC's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Wyatt, James)
July 5, 2011 Filing 58 Attorney Letter regarding ECF registration mailed to Deborah Marie Schmitt; Attorney to comply within 7 days. (tgw)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ENDORSED ORDER granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/29/2011. (Nelson, Katherine)
June 28, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION for Deborah Marie Schmitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1112895, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Deborah B. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission) (Lane, Joseph)
June 24, 2011 Filing 55 Memorandum in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient process and insufficient service of process pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) of the Fed. R. Civ. P., filed by Deborah B. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24) (Smith, Hugh)
June 24, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Citrin on behalf of Deborah B. Foster (Citrin, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2011 Filing 53 Alias Summons Issued as to Mazda Motor Corp....... Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2012 10:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2011. Discovery cutoff 3/2/2012. Motions due by 3/16/2012. Jury Selection set for 7/31/2012 08:45 AM in Courtroom 2A before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Trial to be set during the month of August 2012. Position Regarding Settlement due by 3/2/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/21/2011. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (tgw)
June 21, 2011 Filing 51 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Deborah B. Foster to Mazda Motor Corporation (Smith, Hugh)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient process and insufficient service of process filed by Mazda Motor Corp. Responses due by 6/29/2011, Replies due by 7/6/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/20/2011. (tgw)
June 17, 2011 Filing 49 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wyatt, James)
June 15, 2011 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient process and insufficient service of process pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) of the Fed. R. Civ. P., by Mazda Motor Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit affidavit of Barbara L. Tang) (Wyatt, James)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying without prejudice the #30 Motion for Order Deeming Service of Process on Mazda Motor Corporation Effective. The exhibits (Docs. 31-46) are STRICKEN as improperly filed. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/9/2011. (tgw) Modified on 6/9/2011 (tgw).
June 8, 2011 Filing 46 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 9 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 45 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 8 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 44 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 7 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 43 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 6 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 42 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 4 Part 5 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 41 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 5 Part 4 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 40 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 5 Part 3 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 39 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 5 Part 2 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 38 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 5 Part 1 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 37 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 4 Part 4 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 36 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 4 Part 3 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 35 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 4 Part 2 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 34 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 4 Part 1 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 33 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 3 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 32 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 2 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 31 (STRICKEN PER #47 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 1 by Deborah B. Foster re: #30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective (Smith, Hugh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION service on Mazda Motor Corporation to be deemed effective by Deborah B. Foster. (Smith, Hugh)
May 26, 2011 Answer due from Mazda Motor Corp. on 6/15/2011 (see doc. 29). (tgw)
May 25, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster re #6 Service Order Plaintiff's Notice to Court in Compliance with April 13, 2011 Service Order (Smith, Hugh)
May 18, 2011 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to Mazda Motor Corp...... Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
May 17, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Deborah B. Foster to Mazda Motor Corporation (Smith, Hugh)
May 10, 2011 Filing 26 Attorney Letter re: ECF registration mailed to Hugh Nilsen Smith; Attorney to comply within 7 days. (tgw)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/10/2011. (srr)
May 10, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE by Deborah B. Foster re #8 MOTION for Hugh N. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice Federal Certificate of Good Standing (Lane, Joseph) Modified on 5/10/2011 (tgw).
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Dismiss for reasons as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/5/2011. (tgw)
May 5, 2011 Filing 22 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #20 filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #18 filed by Ford Motor Company. A review of the disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. That review has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (jsc)
May 5, 2011 Filing 21 Documents endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #20 filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement #18 filed by Ford Motor Company. (Steele, William)
May 5, 2011 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Mazda Motor Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Mazda Motor Corporation for Mazda Motor of America, Inc... (Wyatt, James)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/20/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/5/2011. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
May 5, 2011 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company, Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Company.. (Wyatt, James)
May 5, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Mazda Motor of America, Inc., d/b/a Mazda Motor Corporation by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
May 5, 2011 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Wyatt, James)
May 5, 2011 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Wyatt, James)
May 5, 2011 Filing 14 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, Corporate Disclosure Statement #11 filed by Bridgestone Americas, Inc. A review of the disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. That review has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (jsc)
May 5, 2011 Filing 13 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #11 filed by Bridgestone Americas, Inc. (Steele, William)
May 5, 2011 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Steele, William)
May 4, 2011 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Davis, Summer)
May 4, 2011 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations. (Davis, Summer)
May 4, 2011 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Davis, Summer)
May 4, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION for Hugh N. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1088109, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Deborah B. Foster. (Lane, Joseph)
April 18, 2011 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah B. Foster. All Defendants. (Lane, Joseph)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Service Order entered 4/13/2011. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/31/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/13/2011. (tgw)
April 13, 2011 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Mazda Motor Corp., Mazda Motor of America, Inc..... Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
April 12, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Deborah B. Foster (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Service by Cert. Mail) (Lane, Joseph)
April 11, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Deborah B. Foster Request for Service by Certified Mail to All Defendants (Lane, Joseph)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Deborah B. Foster to All Defendants (Lane, Joseph)
April 11, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 1128-1076943, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Deborah B. Foster. (Lane, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2011: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Bridgestone Americas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Brosseau
Represented By: Scott G. Edwards
Represented By: Hope T. Cannon
Represented By: Kenneth Martin Perry
Represented By: Summer Austin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations
Represented By: Marc Brosseau
Represented By: Scott G. Edwards
Represented By: Hope T. Cannon
Represented By: Kenneth Martin Perry
Represented By: Summer Austin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Brosseau
Represented By: Scott G. Edwards
Represented By: Hope T. Cannon
Represented By: Kenneth Martin Perry
Represented By: Summer Austin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire, LLC
Represented By: Marc Brosseau
Represented By: Hope T. Cannon
Represented By: Kenneth Martin Perry
Represented By: Summer Austin Wells
Represented By: Scott G. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone
Represented By: Marc Brosseau
Represented By: Scott G. Edwards
Represented By: Hope T. Cannon
Represented By: Kenneth Martin Perry
Represented By: Summer Austin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor Corp.
Represented By: James Alexander Wyatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: James Alexander Wyatt, III
Represented By: Mark W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor of America, Inc. doing business as Mazda North American Operations
Represented By: James Alexander Wyatt, III
Represented By: Mark W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah B. Foster
Represented By: Deborah Marie Schmitt
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Citrin
Represented By: Hugh Nilsen Smith
Represented By: Joseph D. Lane
Represented By: Marc Jordan Semago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Lee Haggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?