Vision Bank v. Loyal Advertising, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Defendant: Loyal Advertising, LLC, John B. Foley, IV and Lauren M. Foley
Case Number: 1:2011cv00176
Filed: April 11, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2015 133 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 131 Funds Received in the amount of $2,994.42 received by BB&T & its 132 Amended Answer to Garnishment. 130 Order is amended as set out. Funds in the amount of $2,994.42 are condemned, & the Clerk is directed to de posit the funds into the Registry of the Court. Garnishee BB&T is DISCHARGED & released from the writ of garnishment. The Clerk is further directed to disburse said funds to counsel for Plf as set out. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to BB&T. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/30/2015. (copy mailed to BB&T on 10/2/15) (tot)
February 6, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plf's 71 Motion to Condemn & Disburse Funds w/o prejudice as set out. Plf's request to condemn & disburse all monies received from any other source is DENIED as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/6/2013. (tot)
June 20, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of SE Property Holdings, LLC against Loyal Advertising, LLC, John B. Foley, IV, Lauren M. Foley in the total amount of $295,078.24. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/20/2012. (adk)
June 15, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Plf is to submit a proposed Judgment to the court w/proposed damage amounts, including interest calculated through the date of this Order, & attnys' fees. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/15/2012. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Bank v. Loyal Advertising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Represented By: Bradley E. Dean
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Ashley E. Swink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyal Advertising, LLC
Represented By: C. Britton Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B. Foley, IV
Represented By: C. Britton Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren M. Foley
Represented By: C. Britton Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?