Wall v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Micah J. Wall
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Thirdparty_defendant: V.R.E. (a minor) and W.C.E. (a minor)
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv00193
Filed: April 19, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered re: Notice of Settlement and show cause regarding accrued interest. a pro ami settlement hearing is set for 4/2/2012 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Partie s are to file UNDER SEAL a copy of their proposed settlement agreement on or before 3/28/12. The Court finds that six percent (6%) per annum is the appropriate rate to apply, as set out in order.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/14/2012. (cmj)
October 17, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Deposit Funds, as set out; granting in part 18 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem. Brenda J. Pierce is appointed as guardian ad litem for the minor third party defendants. Pierce is to file on or before 10 /28/11, a response to MetLife's motion and Wall's response (docs 18, 19). Any reply to Pierce's response shall be due on or before 11/3/11. The remaining issues shall be addressed after the Court receives the responses and replies. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/17/2011. (copy mailed to Pierce) (cmj)
August 1, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for Met Life to file, by 8/12/2011, a motion for interpleader, supported by legal authority as appropriate. Plaintiff Micah Wall is directed to file, by 8/12/2011, a motion for the appointment of a guardian ad litem as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/1/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: V.R.E. (a minor)
Represented By: Joshua Paul Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: W.C.E. (a minor)
Represented By: Joshua Paul Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah J. Wall
Represented By: Joshua Paul Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?