Johnson v. Ashworth et al

Plaintiff: David L. Johnson
Defendant: Penton Ashworth, K. Dunn, COI Pates, COI Marshall, Cadet Bell and Cadet Mummert
Case Number: 1:2011cv00228
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2015 251 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Dfts James English, James Pate, Roger Marsh, Penton Ashworth, Donald Bell, Chris Mummert against Plf David L. Johnson as set out. Accordingly, Plfs claims against Ashworth, Dunn, Pate, Marsh, Bell, Mummert & English are DISMISSED w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/5/2015. (tot)
March 31, 2015 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 248 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is ORDERED that Plf have & take nothing from defaulting Dfts as set out, & the 244 MOTION for Attorney Fees, as 246 amended, is DENIED because Plf is not a prevailing party under § 1988 as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/31/2015. (tot)
March 27, 2014 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 203 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION & providing clarification as set out. 189 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/27/2014. (tot)
January 30, 2013 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 185 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plf's 179 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Dft Mummert is GRANTED. The amount of damages Dft Mummert owes to Plf will be determined following an evidentiary hrg & incorporated in the final report & recommendation. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/30/2013. (copy mailed to Dft Mummert on 1/30/13) (tot)
October 23, 2012 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 154 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 152 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dft James English is STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/23/2012. (tot)
October 3, 2012 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 149 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, and denying defendants' motions to dismiss (Docs. 119 & 131 ) in their entirety. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/3/2012. (mab)
July 12, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of David L. Johnson against defendant Donald Bell in an amount to be determined following the evidentiary hearing to be held in February of 2013. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/12/2012. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Ashworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penton Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI Pates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadet Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadet Mummert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?