Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Friday Construction Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Friday Construction Company, Inc. and C. Thurmon Bell
Case Number: 1:2011cv00231
Filed: May 9, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against Friday Construction Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/7/2012. (cmj)
October 31, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part [] Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part [] Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff is awarded $12,490.00 in attorneys' fees and $733.56 in expenses and costs against defendant, Friday and post-judgment interest shall accrue at the contractual rate of plaintiff's "prime rate" plus 5% as set out in promissory note. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/31/2012. (cmj)
March 5, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion for (partial) Summary Judgment. It's GRANTED in part in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Friday as to liabilityfor breach of contract (Count One) in the amount of $337,797.57 plus post-judgment interest inaccordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a); and DENIED in part as to its money had/received andunjust enrichment claims (Counts Two-Three), request for attorneys fees and costs, and requestfor a post-judgment interest rat e of Prime Rate plus 5%.Plaintiff is GRANTED LEAVE to file a revised motion for attorneys feesand costs by March 9, 2012, Any responseby Defendant Friday shall be filed no later than March 16, 2012.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/5/2012. (cmj)
November 2, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered that in light of Friday's failure to provide the Court with any authority to supports a request for a stay, it isORDERED that Defendant Friday Construction Company, Inc.s request, as contained in theNotice of Bankruptcy Filing (Doc. 15), is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/2/2011. (cmj)
October 17, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for defendant Friday to provide the Court with authority to support its position that Bell's individual Chapter 11 bankruptcy petition requires a stay of this action as to Friday. This action is STAYED as to BELL. Bell to file status report NLT 1/3/2012. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 10/31/2011, Status Report due by 1/3/2012.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/17/2011. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Friday Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jason Dwight Woodard
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Weed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friday Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: J. Patrick Courtney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Thurmon Bell
Represented By: J. Patrick Courtney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?