Bank of America, N.A. v. W.E. Davis & Sons Construction Co., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Donald Davis
Case Number: 1:2011cv00290
Filed: June 3, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 38 Motion to Dismiss Case w/o Prejudice. Plf's claims against Donald Davis are DISMISSED w/o prejudice as set out. Each party shall bear its/his own costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/2/2013. (tot)
April 4, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 36 Suggestion of Bankruptcy by Dft Donald Davis. This action is STAYED, & the Clerk is directed to place this matter on the court's administrative docket. The parties are to notify the court within 30 days of the resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings, or of a lift of the stay, at which time this action will be reinstated to the court's active docket. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/4/2012. (tot)
June 20, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Dfts. Plfs claims against Dfts W.E. Davis & Sons Construction Co., Inc. & William E. Davis are DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/20/2011. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. W.E. Davis & Sons Construction Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew Warren Grill
Represented By: J. Walton Jackson
Represented By: John Leland Murphree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?