Vasquez v. Wang

Plaintiff: Porfirio Peralta Vasquez
Defendant: Yan Fei Wang
Case Number: 1:2011cv00382
Filed: July 14, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing this action with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the FRCP, as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/9/2012. (cmj)
July 9, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 36 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to file Dispositive Motions filed by Adam Hwang, Hong Da Tokyo Inc.. Discovery cutoff 8/1/2012. Motions due by 8/6/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/9/2012. (sdb)
April 6, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Amend Answer. Amended answer due 4/13/12. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/6/2012. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez v. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porfirio Peralta Vasquez
Represented By: Banks C. Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yan Fei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?