Evanston Insurance Company v. Lett et al

Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Defendant: Kiker Corporation, St. Catherine of Siena Parish and Damon Lett
Case Number: 1:2011cv00383
Filed: July 14, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL AMENDED JUDGMENT that plaintiff has no duty to defend defendant Damon Lett d/b/a Damon Lett Roofing or defendant Kiker Corporation against any of the claims made in the civil action styled St. Catherine of Siena Parish v. Kiker Corporation, et al., Case No. CV-2010-900578, in the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/8/2012. copies to parties. (sdb)
October 15, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings against Damon Lett d/b/a Damon Lett Roofing & granting 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Kiker Corporation filed by Evanston Insurance Company. Evanston & St. Catherine are ordered by 10/26/2012 to file a joint report concerning the status of this action as between them. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/15/2012. Copy mailed to Damon Lett. (tgw)
January 24, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Kiker's Motion to Dismiss and denying St. Catherine's 25 Motion to Dismiss. Additionally, the parties have filed their Report of Parties Planning Meeting (doc. 13). This matter is therefore referred to MagistrateJudge Cassady for entry of a Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order or other appropriate action to get this case on track for discovery, pretrial and trial. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/24/2012. Copy to Judge Cassady's Chambers. (mbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. Lett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiker Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Catherine of Siena Parish
Represented By: Paul V. Lagarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Lett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?