Sullivan v. Clyde Bergemann, Inc.

Appellant: Eugene Sullivan
Defendant: Clyde Bergemann, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00384
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 22 Notice of Settlement filed by Eugene Sullivan. Objection by Appellee Clyde Bergemann due 1/12/12. ( Objection due by 1/12/2012). If no objection is filed, then the motion to dismiss shall be granted and this appeal shall be dismissed without further action by the Court. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/4/2012. (cmj)
December 7, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order construing 19 Status Report filed by Eugene Sullivan to be a motion to lift stay. The stay is lifted and Appellant is to file his reply brief by 12/19/11. ( Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/19/2011.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/7/2011. (cmj)
November 28, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that this action will remain stayed. Joint status report to be filed 1/27/12. ( Status Report due by 1/27/2012.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/28/2011. (cmj)
July 22, 2011 2 Opinion or Order of the Court Order. ( Appellant Brief due by 8/5/2011, Appellee Brief due by 8/19/2011,Appellant Reply Brief due by 8/31/2011.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/22/2011. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Clyde Bergemann, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Eugene Sullivan
Represented By: Terrie Seal Owens
Represented By: Stephen Ward Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Bergemann, Inc.
Represented By: David Walter Hercher
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Represented By: Kirkland E. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?