Valrie v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Valrie
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00404
Filed: July 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2012 Filing 85 FINAL JUDGMENT, Plf's claims against Dft, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE. Costs are taxed against Plf. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/3/2012. (tot)
November 13, 2012 Filing 84 STATUS REPORT on Class Claims (Joint) by Jacqueline Valrie, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Riemer, Kenneth)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING Dft's #65 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Plf's #73 Motion to Strike Certain Expert Testimony is DENIED AS MOOT as set out. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report as set out on or before 11/13/12. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/29/2012. (tot)
October 3, 2012 Filing 82 NOTICE by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC of Supplemental Authority In Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Newman, J.)
September 17, 2012 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion #65 filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Newman, J.)
September 17, 2012 Filing 80 Memorandum in Opposition re #73 MOTION to Exclude Exhibit E - Expert Report of Laura J. Borrelli attached to #66 Memorandum in Support of #65 M/SJ filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Newman, J.)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ENDORSED ORDER granting #78 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief in Support of #65 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendant's reply brief shall be filed no later than 9/17/2012. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/24/2012. (mab)
August 24, 2012 Filing 78 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Newman, J.)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #70 Motion to Compel payment of expert fees. See Doc. 76. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/24/2012. (dhf)
August 23, 2012 Filing 76 RESPONSE to Motion re: #70 MOTION to Compel Payment of Fees Associated with Plaintiff's Deposition of Its Expert filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Underwood, Earl)
August 20, 2012 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Mortgage, #2 Exhibit 2-Note, #3 Exhibit 3-depo excerpts of Loll, #4 Exhibit 4-Guidelines, #5 Exhibit 5-Assignment, #6 Exhibit 6-Foreclosure Letter, #7 Exhibit 7-depo excerpts of J. Valrie) (Riemer, Kenneth)
August 20, 2012 Filing 74 Brief in Support of #73 Motion to Exclude The Expert Report and Testimony of Borrelli, filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" excerpts from Experts Report) (Underwood, Earl)
August 20, 2012 Filing 73 MOTION to Exclude Expert Report of Laura J. Borrelli, Exhibit E to #66 Memorandum in Support of #65 M/SJ by Jacqueline Valrie. (Underwood, Earl)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order re: #70 MOTION to Compel Payment of Fees Associated with Plaintiff's Deposition of Its Expert filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Plf's response due by 8/23/2012. Nationstar's reply due by 8/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/9/2012. (tot)
August 8, 2012 Filing 71 Memorandum in Support re #70 MOTION to Compel Payment of Fees Associated with Plaintiff's Deposition of Its Expert filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Newman, J.)
August 8, 2012 Filing 70 MOTION to Compel Payment of Fees Associated with Plaintiff's Deposition of Its Expert by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's #68 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's #65 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/20/2012. Defendant's reply due by 9/4/2012. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/4/2012. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/31/2012. (mab)
July 31, 2012 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #65 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #67 Order on Summary Judgment (Response Time), by Jacqueline Valrie. (Riemer, Kenneth)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order re: #65 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows:Response to S/J due by 8/6/2012; Replies to Response to S/J due by 8/20/2012; Motion to be taken under submission on 8/21/2012. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/18/2012. (tot)
July 16, 2012 Filing 66 Memorandum in Support re #65 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Newman, J.)
July 16, 2012 Filing 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING Plf's #58 Motion to Amend #32 Scheduling Order as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/2/2012. (tot)
June 25, 2012 Filing 63 RESPONSE to Motion re: #58 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order #32 Scheduling Order,, filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
June 25, 2012 Filing 62 Notice of Filing filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
June 25, 2012 Filing 61 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Deposition Duces Techum filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Underwood, Earl)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #58 MOTION to Amend #32 Scheduling Order filed by Jacqueline Valrie. Responses due by 7/3/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. Motion to be taken under submission on 7/12/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/19/2012. (sdb)
June 18, 2012 Filing 59 Notice of Filing Subpoena filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Underwood, Earl)
June 18, 2012 Filing 58 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order #32 Scheduling Order,, by Jacqueline Valrie. (Underwood, Earl)
June 13, 2012 Filing 57 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Deposition Duces Tecum and Certificate of Service filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Underwood, Earl)
June 11, 2012 Filing 56 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Non Party Subpoena for the Production of Documents filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Underwood, Earl)
June 6, 2012 Filing 55 Notice of Filing filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
June 4, 2012 Filing 54 Notice of Filing filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
May 18, 2012 Filing 53 Notice of Filing filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ENDORSED ORDER granting #51 Motion for Jason E. Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice as additional counsel for the defendant, Nationstar Mortgage LLC., inasmuch as an appropriate application (doc. 51-1) and certificate of good standing (doc. 51-2) have been filed and the requisite fee has been paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/11/2012. (dhf)
May 10, 2012 Filing 51 MOTION for Jason E. Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1264022, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission to Practice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Manning, Jason)
May 7, 2012 Filing 50 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #48 filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (cer)
May 7, 2012 Filing 49 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #48 filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (dhf)
May 4, 2012 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
May 4, 2012 Filing 47 Notice of Filing Amended Notices of Deposition filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.) Modified on 5/7/2012 (tot).
April 30, 2012 Filing 46 Notice of Filing filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
April 30, 2012 Filing 45 Notice of Filing filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
April 17, 2012 Filing 44 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Amended Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition to Nationstar Mortgage filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Riemer, Kenneth)
April 11, 2012 Filing 43 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Interrogatory Requests filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Riemer, Kenneth)
March 30, 2012 Filing 42 Notice of Filing Responses to Request for Production and Request for Admissions filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Riemer, Kenneth)
February 22, 2012 Filing 41 Notice of Filing filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
February 17, 2012 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING #37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Dft's #14 MOTION to Dismiss is DENIED. Dft is to file its answer to the complaint within 14 days after entry of this order on the docket. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/3/12. (tot)
February 3, 2012 Answer due from Nationstar Mortgage, LLC on 2/17/2012 - See Doc. #39 . (tot)
January 31, 2012 Filing 38 Notice of Filing Ojbections and Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that NationStar's #14 MOTION to Dismiss be DENIED & that NationStar be ordered to file its answer to the Complaint by a specific time established by the Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/1/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/18/2012. (tot)
December 29, 2011 Filing 36 Notice of Filing Plaintiffs First Request for Admissions, First Request for Production, First Set of Interrogatories to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Plaintiffs Notice of 30(B)(6) Deposition Duces Tecum filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Underwood, Jr., Earl)
December 19, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC of Service of Its Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Newman, J.)
November 30, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing of Additional Authority in Opposition to Defendant's #14 Motion to Dismiss by Jacqueline Valrie re #29 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Supplement the slip opinion in William C. Squires v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Case Number 11-0413-WS-M, United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama) (Underwood, Jr., Earl) Modified on 11/30/2011 (mab).
November 28, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE by Jacqueline Valrie NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Underwood, Jr., Earl)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial, pretrial conference and pretrial disclosure dates will be set once class action status is determined. Motions for leave to amend pleadings and join parties due by 1/27/2012. Discovery on individual plaintiffs' claims and on class certification issues, including experts, if any, to be completed by 7/2/2012. Dispositive and Class Certification Motions due by 7/16/2012. Supplemental Rule 26(f) report due not later than 14 days after the Court's ruling on any motion for class certification. Supplemental Rule 26(f) report due by 12/2/2011 if parties anticipate production of ESI. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/22/2011. (mab)
November 9, 2011 Filing 31 REPLY to #29 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
November 4, 2011 Filing 30 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Newman, J.)
October 20, 2011 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Riemer, Kenneth)
October 13, 2011 Filing 28 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #26 filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (dhf)
October 12, 2011 Filing 27 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #26 filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (jts)
October 12, 2011 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order, Dft Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, is to file its disclosure statement on or before 10/12/2011 or SHOW CAUSE by that date why it is not able to comply w/LR 3.4. The Clerk is directed to attach a copy of a blank disclosure statement to this order. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/5/2011. (Attachment: #1 Blank Disclosure Statement) (tot)
October 5, 2011 Filing 24 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson and is now assigned to the docket of Judge Callie V. S. Granade. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (srr)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion, as #22 supplemented, filed by John C. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice as additional counsel for the defendant, NationStar Mortgage, LLC, upon consideration of the application, certificate of good standing and the payment of the application fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/28/2011. (dhf)
September 28, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC Application for Pro Hac Vice (Lynch, John)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re motion to dismiss; Responses due by 10/20/2011 Replies due by 11/9/2011. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/9/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/28/2011. (srr)
September 27, 2011 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Jacqueline Valrie. (Riemer, Kenneth)
September 26, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION for John C. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Receipt No 21748 - $50.00. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (srr)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC; Responses due by 9/30/201. Replies due by 10/7/2011. Motion to be taken under submission on 10/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/20/2011. (srr)
September 20, 2011 Filing 17 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 10/4/2011. Only one consent form, signed by counsel for all parties, is to be filed. If written consent is not filed by that date, or if any party requests reassignment prior to that date, this action will be reassigned to a United States District Judge. (Attachments: #1 consent form, #2 request for reassignment) (srr)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/4/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/20/2011. (Attachments: #1 consent form) (srr)
September 19, 2011 Filing 15 Brief filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC re #14 MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A, #2 Exhibit EX B) (Newman, J.)
September 19, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Newman, J.)
August 24, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Earl P. Underwood on behalf of Jacqueline Valrie (Underwood, Earl)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, in view of Plaintiff's consent. Answer due by 9/19/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/19/2011. (dhf)
August 18, 2011 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Newman, J.)
August 17, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Blair Newman, Jr on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Newman, J.)
August 17, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward S. Sledge, III on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Sledge, Edward)
August 8, 2011 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacqueline Valrie. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC served on 7/28/2011, answer due 8/18/2011. (Riemer, Kenneth)
August 5, 2011 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr)
August 4, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Jacqueline Valrie to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Riemer, Kenneth)
August 4, 2011 Filing 5 LETTER from CT Corporation stating they are not the agent for Nationstar Mortgage LLC (srr)
August 2, 2011 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Summons Issued to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC Acknowledgement filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Riemer, Kenneth)
August 2, 2011 Answer due from Nationstar Mortgage, LLC on 8/18/2011. (srr)
July 25, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr)
July 25, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Jacqueline Valrie to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Riemer, Kenneth)
July 25, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 1128-1124729, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Jacqueline Valrie. (Riemer, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2011: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (srr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valrie v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Valrie
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Edward S. Sledge, III
Represented By: J. Blair Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Manning
Represented By: John C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?