McCall v. Mitchem

Petitioner: Leon McCall
Respondent: Billy Mitchem
Case Number: 1:2011cv00507
Filed: August 29, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/19/2012. (copy mailed to McCall) (cmj)
June 1, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the Petitioner's request for habeas corpus relief is DISMISSED as time-barred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 2244(d). The Petitioner is not entitled to a certificate of appealability and therefore, is not entitled to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/1/2012. copy mailed to petitioner. (sdb)
April 2, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Leon McCall, recommending the petition be dismissed as time barred. The 6 MOTION for 1 Petiton for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by person in state custody to be held in abeyance filed by Leon McCall is denied in light of the R&R. Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/30/12. (copy mailed to petitioner) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Mitchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leon McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Billy Mitchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?