Kruse v. Byrne et al
Plaintiff: Frank Kruse
Defendant: Dale Byrne and Carla Wasdin
Case Number: 1:2011cv00513
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 JUDGMENT is entered against Plaintiff and in favor of Defendants Dale Byrne, Kenneth EarlMay, Connie Johanna Pimperl, Rocky Lee Langham, Gregory E. Pinkard, Steve R. Drinkard,Edward Scott, and the Baldwin County Commission on all of Plaintiffs claims against them in this action, which are DISMISSED with prejudice; JUDGMENT is entered against Plaintiff and in favor of Defendant Jimmie L. Williams onPlaintiffs claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 against her in Count I of the Second AmendedComplaint (Doc. 75); and Plaintiffs state law claims against Defendants Jimmie L. Williams and Charles E. Sherman(Counts IV, V, and VI of the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 75)) are DISMISSED withoutprejudice, as the Court declines to continue exercising supplemental jurisdiction over them pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/3/2013. (cmj)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Order re: 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jimmie L. Williams, Connie Johanna Pimperl, Kenneth Earl May. The 110 Motion is GRANTED IN PART. GRANTED as to Defendants Pimperl and May and for reasons stated infra, the Court withhold s ruling on the motion as it relates to Defendant Williams. Discovery is reopened until 10/28/2013, for the limited purpose of allowing Jemal Walker to be deposed. Williams is permitted to file, by 10/28/2013, a supplement to her Reply (Doc. [ 137]) that addresses any pertinent evidence obtained during this supplemental discovery period. The 110 Motion for summary judgment will be taken under submission on 10/29/2013. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/7/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER ADOPTING 95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS with the exception of the Magistrate Judge's recommendation to deny the motion to dismiss the wrongful death claims against Drinkard, Langham, Scott and Pinkard. It is ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the wrongful death claims against Drinkard, Langham, Scott and Pinkard is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/8/2012. (sdb)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 66 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/25/2012. (cmj)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 67 Motion to Stay as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/5/2012. (sdb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruse v. Byrne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Kruse
Represented By: William Reeves Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Wasdin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?