Oliver v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Michael Darnell Oliver
Defendant: Johnny L. Johnson, C. Kimbrel, Sgt. Bailey, T. Betts, R. Armstrong and Shelton Forney
Case Number: 1:2011cv00520
Filed: September 9, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 109 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 28 Complaint filed by Michael Darnell Oliver. Judgment is entered in favor of defendants Broadhead, Stanton, Gipson, Kimbrel, Tyus and Andrews and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/16/2015. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
September 11, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 77 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carrol, K. Tyus, R. Armstrong, C. Kimbrel, Shelton Forney, Johnny L. Johnson, C. Andrews, Earnest Stanton, J. Broadhead, Russell Johnson, K. Reyno lds, Sgt. Bailey, T. Betts, C. Daughtry, Anthony Gipson. The motion is GRANTED in part and Plaintiff's claims arising out of the incident on July 10, 2011 and involving Defendants Forney, Bailey, Reynolds, Armstrong, Johnson, Kimbrel, and Be tts are DISMISSED. Plaintiff's claims arising out of the incidents occurring 08/24-25/11 and involving Defendants Johnson, Kimbrel, Broadhead, Stanton, Gipson, Daughtry, Johnson, and Carroll as DISMISSED and DENIED in part. This action will proceed with regard to Plaintiff's excessive force claims arising out of the 11/12/11 incident involving Defendants Kimbrel, Tyus, Andrews, Broadhead, Stanton, and Gipson.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/11/2014. (adk)
August 8, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/7/2012. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
July 13, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT denying as moot plaintiff's motion for order of injunction (doc. 16). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/13/2012. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Darnell Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Kimbrel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelton Forney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?