Prince Hotel, SA v. Blake Marine Group et al

Plaintiff: Prince Hotel, SA
Defendant: Blake Marine Group and Eli Zatezalo
Case Number: 1:2011cv00537
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 83 Motion for Directed Verdict or Judgment as a Matter of Law Concerning Damages. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/30/2013. (tgw)
October 2, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 46 Motion to Strike; denying 50 Motion to Strike; denying 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. This action remains set for Pretrial Conference on 1/15/2013 at 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/2/2012. (tgw)
May 8, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 48 Rule 56(d) Motion Requesting Discovery to Justify Further Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Blake Marine Group. Plaintiff's reply brief to its Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 40) is due by 5/17/2012. Defendant's supplemental brief in opposition to summary judgment is due by 6/18/2012. Plaintiff's supplemental brief is due by 6/25/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/8/2012. (tgw)
March 13, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying the defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 19, 20, 22 & 23). Answer due from Blake Marine Group on 3/27/2012; Eli Zatezalo on 3/27/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/13/2012. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince Hotel, SA v. Blake Marine Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Hotel, SA
Represented By: Wayne Jerry King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Marine Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Zatezalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?