Evans v. Davenport et al

Petitioner: Leslie Evans
Respondent: State of Alabama and Carter F. Davenport
Case Number: 1:2011cv00544
Filed: September 19, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Escambia
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Leslie Evans. It is recommended that Evans' 24 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis be denied. Signed by Judge DuBose on 6/29/2012. (copy to Appellant). (jal)
June 4, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 Denying MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Leslie Evans. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/23/2012. (Clerk mailed copy to Appellant). (jal) Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/4/2012.
March 22, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/22/2012. (copy mailed to petitioner) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Davenport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carter F. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leslie Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?