Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Southern Haulers, LLC

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Southern Haulers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00564
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 104 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 107 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 122 Motion to exclude experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/10/2013. (srr)
November 21, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Motion to Compel; Southern Haulers shall produce the documents at issue within 7 business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/20/2012. (srr)
July 20, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/20/2012. (srr)
May 17, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion to Quash Subpoenas, Williams' motion for protective order is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/17/2012. (srr)
March 14, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion to Strike or, alternatively, to dismiss certain affirmative defenses asserted by Southern Haulers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/14/2012. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Southern Haulers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Haulers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Julie Bean
Represented By: Marsha Lynn Rucker
Represented By: C. Emanuel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?