Lee v. The Krystal Company et al

Plaintiff: Reena Lee
Defendant: The Krystal Company, Brian Broome and Vernon J. McLemore
Case Number: 1:2011cv00627
Filed: November 4, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 46 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 53 Motion for Default Judgment. The Crossclaim is dismissed for failure to state a claim. The Clerks Office is directed to close this file for administrative and statisticalpurposes. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/4/2013. (mbp)
January 23, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion to Dismiss filed by Bryan Broome & Vernon McLemore. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/23/2013. Copy mailed to Bryan Broome. (tgw)
January 15, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded reasonable attorney's fees in the total amount of $22,577.50, and costs in the amount of $615.87. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/15/2013. (tgw)
August 28, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 32 Acceptance of Defendant's Offer of Judgment & Motion for Approval and Acceptance of Same filed by Reena Lee. Lee is ordered by 9/18/2012 to submit her attorney's fee petition as set out. Krystal's Response is due by 10/2/2012, Replies due by 10/9/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/28/2012. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. The Krystal Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reena Lee
Represented By: Banks C. Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Krystal Company
Represented By: John R. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Broome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon J. McLemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?