Group CG Builders and Contractors et al v. Cahaba Disaster Recovery, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Laura Cabrera and Group CG Builders and Contractors
Defendant: DRC Emergency Services, LLC, Cahaba Disaster Recovery, LLC and Stewart Gamble Fuzzell, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00729
Filed: December 29, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this action on forum non conveniens grounds subject to conditions as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/7/2012. (cmj)
May 25, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that defendants are requested to file a supplemental brief in response to this order by 6/8/2012 as set out in order; Replies due by 6/15/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/25/2012. (srr)
March 8, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for defendants Cahaba Disaster Recovery LLC and DRC Emergency Services LLC, to each separately file a Notice of LLC Membership as set out. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 4/13/2012.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/7/2012. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Group CG Builders and Contractors et al v. Cahaba Disaster Recovery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRC Emergency Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cahaba Disaster Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Gamble Fuzzell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Cabrera
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Represented By: Maurice John Steensland, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Group CG Builders and Contractors
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Represented By: Corey E. Dunbar
Represented By: Maurice John Steensland, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?