Palm Beach Vacation Owners Association, Inc. v. Escapes!, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Palm Beach Vacation Owners Association, Inc.
Defendant: Escapes to the Gulf, Inc., Escapes! Property Management, LLC and Escapes!, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Escapes to the Gulf, Inc., Escapes!, Inc. and Escapes! Property Management, LLC
Counter_defendant: Palm Beach Vacation Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00027
Filed: January 17, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered confirming the "Award of Arbitrators" and dismissing Plaintiffs' claims with prejudice as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/10/2014. (cmj)
October 18, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 96 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 78 MOTION to Dismiss ; 81 MOTION to Dismiss; 75 MOTION to Dismiss as set out. All of Plaintiff Palm Beach Condominium Owners Association, Inc.'s remaining claims are referred to arbitration in accordance with the terms of the relevant arbitration agreement. This action is STAYED pending resolution of arbitration proceedings. The case is closed for statistical purposes and the parties are directed to file a joint status report no later than 1/18/13. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/18/2012. (cmj)
June 21, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Compel Arbitration as to all claims asserted by all Plaintiffs other than the COA. The proceedings by Plaintiffs VOA, Pope and Bobsin are STAYED pending resolution of arbitration. The parties are to file a status rep ort by 9/17/12. The Motion to Amend Complaint 41 is granted in part with respect to the COA's amendment to Count Three and otherwise denied as moot. COA is to file an amended complaint as set out, by 6/26/12 and defendants are to respond by 7/9/12. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/21/2012. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palm Beach Vacation Owners Association, Inc. v. Escapes!, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escapes to the Gulf, Inc.
Represented By: P. Russel Myles
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escapes! Property Management, LLC
Represented By: P. Russel Myles
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escapes!, Inc.
Represented By: P. Russel Myles
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Escapes to the Gulf, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Lieb
Represented By: P. Russel Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Escapes!, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Lieb
Represented By: P. Russel Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Escapes! Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Lieb
Represented By: P. Russel Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Palm Beach Vacation Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: M. Lloyd Roebuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Beach Vacation Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Rayborn Sport
Represented By: M. Lloyd Roebuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?