QBE Insurance Corporation v. Whispering Pines Cemetery, LLC et al

Plaintiff: QBE Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Queen Pettway, Carlis Eaton, Rosie May Abrams, Courtney Vashay, Jermaine Abrams, Tamara Martin, Lesester Williams and Whispering Pines Cemetery, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv00054
Filed: January 27, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 115 Motion to Vacate ; granting 116 Motion to Dismiss. This action is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/27/2014. (cmj)
February 19, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 Motion to Vacate ; denying 110 Motion to Dismiss as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/18/2014. (cmj)
February 25, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 79 Motion to Strike as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/25/2013. (cmj)
February 22, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/22/2013. (cmj)
September 26, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Stay; denying 34 Supplemental Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/26/2012. (cmj)
February 28, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: doc. 5 - Suggestion of Bankruptcy of Whispering Pines Cemetery, LLC. This action is STAYED as to this defendant. Plaintiff is ordered to file a status report on or before 6/4/12 as set out. ( Status Report due by 6/4/2012.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/28/2012. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QBE Insurance Corporation v. Whispering Pines Cemetery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen Pettway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlis Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie May Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Vashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesester Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whispering Pines Cemetery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Franklin
Represented By: Stewart Leon Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?