Hollingshead v. Mobile County Personnel Board et al

Plaintiff: Dorothy Mae Hollingshead
Defendant: James D. Hanson and Mobile County Personnel Board for Alabama
Case Number: 1:2012cv00070
Filed: February 2, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that this action is DISMISSED w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/21/2012. (copy mailed to Plf on 12/21/12) (tot)
October 15, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, 44 Objections to Discovery Requests (Docs. 42 & 43 ) are SUSTAINED. Plf's 45 Motion for Subpoena is DENIED as set out, & Plf is directed not to serve any further discovery requests on dft or seek further discovery by Court order until the Court has issued an opinion on dft's motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/15/2012. (copy mailed to Plf on 10/15/12) (tot)
June 1, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James D. Hanson is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/1/2012. (copy mailed to Plf on 6/1/12) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollingshead v. Mobile County Personnel Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Mae Hollingshead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile County Personnel Board for Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?