Jackson v. GMAC Mortgage Corporation

Plaintiff: Corla Jackson
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv00111
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court Order lifting stay and ordering plaintiff to show cause by 5/22/17 explaining why her case should not be dismissed. ( Show Cause Response due by 5/22/2017.). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/1/2017. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
February 3, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 60 Notice of Removal filed by Corla Jackson, remanding the state court action to the Circuit Court of Mobile County, AL. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/3/2016. (copy to Corla Jackson and remand to Mobile County via email) (cmj)
June 5, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 24 Motion to Lift Stay as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/4/2012. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. GMAC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corla Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jon Howard Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?