Gaillard v. Commins et al

Plaintiff: Winston Gaillard
Defendant: Samuel Commins and City of Satsuma
Case Number: 1:2012cv00228
Filed: March 30, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Motion in Limine; granting 85 Motion in Limine; denying 86 Motion in Limine; granting 87 Motion in Limine; granting 88 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/29/2014. (tgw)
October 21, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 63 Motion to exclude the testimony of defense experts Joey Parker and Ken Katsaris. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/21/2014. (tgw)
March 25, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/25/2013. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaillard v. Commins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Gaillard
Represented By: Jubal L. Hamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Commins
Represented By: Andrew John Rutens
Represented By: Alicia Jacob Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Satsuma
Represented By: J. Marshall Gardner
Represented By: Joseph J. Minus, Jr.
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?