Rudolph v. Barber et al

Plaintiff: Sekou T. Rudolph
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc., Donny Myers, Rene Nettles, Pamela Barber and Debra Poindexter
Case Number: 1:2012cv00263
Filed: April 13, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 69 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Request to Proceed In forma Pauperis is hereby DENIED because the appeal is frivolous, without arguable merit and not taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/3/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. Copy of R&R (Doc. 69) & this order mailed to ADOC & Business Manager at Ventress Correctional Facility. (tgw)
March 14, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Defendants Dr. Pamela Barber, Rene Nettles, Debra Poindexter, Donny Myers, and Correctional Medical Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice from Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/14/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
January 2, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiffs Motion to Amend (Doc. 33 ) be DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/2/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudolph v. Barber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Poindexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sekou T. Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?