Tangen v. Ideacom of the Gulf Coast, Inc.

Plaintiff: Erlend Tangen
Defendant: Ideacom of the Gulf Coast, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00267
Filed: April 16, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of Erlend Tangen against Ideacom of the Gulf Coast, Inc., in the amount of $110,500.70, plus attorney's fees in the amount of $50,805.00 and costs in the amount of $3,359.88. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/13/2014. (mab)
October 31, 2013 132 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Bench Trial, the court finds that judgment is due to be entered in Tangen's favor in the total amount of $110,500.70, plus reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Itemized list of attorney's fees plaintiff is claiming due 11/14/2013. Ideacom's reply due 11/21/2013. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/31/2013. (mab)
June 27, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Ideacom's 85 Motion for Summary Judgment: GRANTED IN PART with regard to Count One, DENIED as to Count Two, and GRANTED as to Count Three; and denying Ideacom's 93 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/27/2013. (mab)
August 6, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, and denying 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ideacom of the Gulf Coast, Inc. Answer to 14 amended complaint due from Ideacom of the Gulf Coast, Inc. no later than 8/20/2012. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/6/2012. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangen v. Ideacom of the Gulf Coast, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erlend Tangen
Represented By: Michael M. Shipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideacom of the Gulf Coast, Inc.
Represented By: Max Cassady, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?